Wayne County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45585 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 17, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 5:18-cv-00189 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:49 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Medisca, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:33 PM EDT |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4486996.), filed by Wayne County. (Whitaker, Garry) [Transferred from nced on 5/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
Notice to Counsel - Counsel is to file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 5/17/2018.] | ||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Garry B. Whitaker on behalf of Wayne County. (Whitaker, Garry) [Transferred from nced on 5/17/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 5/15/2018.) (Briggeman, N.) [Transferred from nced on 5/17/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Eastern. Case number 5:18-cv-00189. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |