Richmond County, North Carolina v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45586 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 17, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:18-cv-00350 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:49 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Richmond County, North Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:34 PM EDT |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2340937.), filed by RICHMOND COUNTY, NORTH CAROLINA.(COATES, PAUL) [Transferred from ncmd on 5/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from ncmd on 5/17/2018.] | ||
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29) Re: MDL 1407 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017. Received and filed on 5/15/2018. (Butler, Carol) [Transferred from ncmd on 5/17/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:18-cv-00350. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |