New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:18-cr-01289
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2018
Terminated:Oct 16, 2018
Last checked: Sunday May 20, 2018 1:16 AM MDT
Defendant
Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca (1)
Represented By
Rachel A. Nathanson
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joni Lee Autrey
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/13/2019 1:52 PM MDT
Sunday, January 07, 2018
Arrest of Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca (bw) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
Set/Reset Hearings as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca: Initial Appearance set for 1/9/2018 at 08:37 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (bw) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
Attorney update in case as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca. Attorney Joni Lee Autrey for USA added. (vh*) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca. (vh) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Rachel A. Nathanson for Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt (vh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Initial Appearance as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca held on 1/9/2018. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Pretrial Services Interview Requested. Appearances: AUSA: Marty Woelfle; AFPD: Steve Sosa; FPD Standing In; Interpreter: Edith Monroy. Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 8:39 AM - 8:41 AM. Time In Session: 8:56 AM - 9:01 AM. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt for 1/12/2018, at 09:35 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (vh) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
5 5 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca held on 1/12/2018; Detention hearing continued and to be reset at a later date; Defendant in custody. Related [+] (Interpreter: Edith Monroy) (jv) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR Sierra Blanca
6 6 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing/Grand Jury Presentment within 75 days for a total of 105 days pursuant to 18:3161 by Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca (jv) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt (jv) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca: Detention Hearing set for 1/18/2018 at 09:36 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. [ Interpreter Needed ](sju) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
9 9 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Detention Hearing as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca held on 1/18/2018 Related [+] (bc) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR Sierra Blanca
10 10 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt (bc) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
11 11 NOTICE of Intention to Enter Guilty Plea by Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca (Nathanson, Rachel) [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
12 12 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca: Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 380 Animas Courtroom (South Tower) before District Judge J. Thomas Marten. Please direct all inquiries to JoAnn Standridge at JoAnn_Standridge@nmcourt.fed.us [Interpreter Needed](js) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:18-mj-00079-GJF]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
13 13 INFORMATION as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jv)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca (jv)
Related: [-]
15 15 11 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca (jv)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge J. Thomas Marten: Plea Hearing as to Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca held on 4/20/2018, Plea entered by Alan Efren Arellano-Montes de Oca (1) Guilty Count 1,2. Related [+] (jv)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Animas