Barnes v. Liberty High School et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | John V Acosta |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00877 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 14, 2018 1:11 AM PST |
Defendant
Hillsboro School District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Liberty High School
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Greg Timmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Addison Barnes
280 SE 12th Apt B503
Hillsboro, OR 97123 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
![]() JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER OF DISMISS - Pursuant to the parties' stipulation under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 l(a)(l )(A)(ii), this action is dismissed with prejudice as to all claims, causes of action, and parties. The Clerk is directed to close the file. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 10th day of July, 2018, by Chief United States District Judge, Michael W. Mosman. (peg) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by Addison Barnes. (Becker, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Greg Timmons waiver sent on 5/22/2018. Filed by Addison Barnes. (Becker, Benjamin) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Hillsboro School District waiver sent on 5/22/2018. Filed by Addison Barnes. (Becker, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Temporary Restraining Order: For reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED. The Court orders that Defendants are restrained from preventing Plaintiff Addison Barnes from wearing the t-shirt at issue in this case for the remainder of the 2017-2018 Liberty High school year. Signed on 5/30/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
minute
Motion Hearing Held
Tue 05/29 2:51 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral argument held. For the reasons stated on the record, the Motion for the Temporary Restraining Order8 is GRANTED. The parties are to submit a joint proposed order by 4:30PM today. The parties are to contact the Court with a joint proposed preliminary injunction schedule. Benjamin R. Becker, Bradley A. Benbrook and Stephen M. Duvernay present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Beth Plass and Peter Mersereau present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Declaration of Amanda Ryan-Fear . Filed by Hillsboro School District, Liberty High School, Greg Timmons. (Mersereau, Peter) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Declaration of Greg Timmons . Filed by Hillsboro School District, Liberty High School, Greg Timmons. (Mersereau, Peter) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 8 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Hillsboro School District, Liberty High School, Greg Timmons. (Mersereau, Peter) |
|
16 | 16
attyadm
Notification of New Pro Hac Vice or MDL CM/ECF Account
Tue 05/29 8:37 AM
Notification of CM/ECF Account for Stephen M. Duvernay ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: smduvernay . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (ecp) |
|
15 | 15
![]() ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen M. Duvernay for Addison Barnes. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5425553 issued. Signed on 5/29/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) |
|
14 | 14
attyadm
Notification of New Pro Hac Vice or MDL CM/ECF Account
Tue 05/29 8:35 AM
Notification of CM/ECF Account for Bradley A. Benbrook ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: babenbrook . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (ecp) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bradley A. Benbrook for Addison Barnes. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5425520 issued. Signed on 5/29/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) |
|
Monday, May 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Supplement Exhibits 1-3 for Decl Barnes ISO Motion for TRO . Filed by Addison Barnes. (Becker, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen M. Duvernay . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5425553. Filed by Addison Barnes. (Becker, Benjamin) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley A. Benbrook . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5425520. Filed by Addison Barnes. (Becker, Benjamin) |
|
9 | 9
order
1 - Scheduling
Fri 05/25 10:41 AM
Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 8 . Oral Argument is set for 5/29/2018 at 01:00PM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Addison Barnes. (Becker, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerks Notice of Pay.gov Refund
Tue 05/22 11:08 AM
Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5417995. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Benjamin Becker Related Doc4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction
Mon 05/21 4:04 PM
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding3 Exhibits. The PDF attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. The document was missing a case caption cover page. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 9/18/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/18/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 10/18/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |