Ogles v. Security Benefit Life Insurance Company et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Holly L Teeter |
Referred: | Kenneth G Gale |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02265 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 18, 2018 2:33 AM CST |
Defendant
Guggenheim Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Security Benefit Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Security Benefit Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Guggenheim Investments
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eldridge Industries, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Albert Ogles
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Royal Bank of Scotland plc
Terminated: 10/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
90 | 90
appeal
Mandate
Fri 07/10 4:48 PM
APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: dismissing appeal upon motion for voluntary dismissal. (Appeal No. 19-3154 (smc) (smc) |
|
Att: 1 (7/10/2020) Transmittal Letter |