EXCO Resources, Inc. et al v. WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:18-ap-03103 |
Nature of Suit | 71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raider Marketing, LP
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raider Marketing GP, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Services, Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Resources (XA), LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Partners GP, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Operating Company, LP
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Land Company, LLC
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Holding MLP, Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Holding (PA), Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO GP Partners Old, LP
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Resources, Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/08 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 03/07/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Tue 03/05 8:44 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal and Agreed Order, Signed on 3/4/2019 (rltd doc27 ). (rcas) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Mon 03/04 12:44 PM
Stipulation By EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO Services, Inc., MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC, Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Raider Marketing, LP, WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC and Willliams MLP Operating LLC and Mockingbird Midstream Gas Services, LLC. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO Services, Inc., MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC, Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Raider Marketing, LP, WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC ). (Jackson, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Cont
Tue 02/26 11:20 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Re-Set Due to the Court's schedule, this pre-trial conference has been re-set. Plaintiff to re-notice. At the rescheduled pre-trial conference, the Court will re-set the 6/6/2019 trial date, as well. The parties are to be prepared with alternative dates for the rescheduling of the trial. Pre-trial conference rescheduled for 5/20/2019 at 10:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
||
Saturday, August 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/18 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 08/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 08/17 3:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Steven W Soule Filed by on behalf of MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC, WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC (Soule, Steven) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Thu 08/16 11:40 AM
Comprehensive Scheduling Order Signed on 8/16/2018. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). Pre-Trial Order due by 4/29/2019. Discovery due by 4/11/2019. Trial date set for 6/6/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (kpico) |
|
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Thu 08/16 3:58 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:00 AM. Appearances: Michael Riordan for Plaintiffs, John Richer (by tel.) for Defendants, Greg Jackson (by tel.) for Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP, and Steven Soule (by tel.) for Louisiana Midstream Gas Services, LLC, et al. . Parties provide status report and discuss scheduling order deadlines. Pre-trial Conference will be held on May 13, 2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). Trial will commence on June 6, 2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). Scheduling order signed. (kpico) |
||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney)
Wed 08/15 2:57 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By EXCO Resources, Inc. ). (Riordan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery and Pre-Trial Timeline | ||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice
Mon 08/13 9:58 AM
Corrected Notice of Motion to Withdraw . Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Levine, Steven) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Withdraw Document
Mon 08/13 9:42 AM
Motion to Withdraw Document . Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Levine, Steven) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 07/27 10:13 AM
Proposed Order RE: (Filed By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors ) (Levine, Steven) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Intervene
Fri 07/27 10:07 AM
Motion to Intervene. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Levine, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/26 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 07/25/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Mon 07/23 7:46 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to16 Transcript. Parties notified (hcar) |
|
Sunday, July 22, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
13
pgs
court
Transcript
Sun 07/22 7:47 PM
Transcript RE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on July 19, 2018 before Judge Marvin Isgur. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 10/22/2018. (mhen) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Mon 07/23 7:34 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:00. Appearances: A.Swartzman;....Party stated matter was previously reset to August 16, 2018 at 11:00. No action taken by the court . (rcas) |
||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate
Mon 07/16 5:41 PM
Certificate of Notice (Filed By EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO Services, Inc., Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Raider Marketing, LP ) (Riordan, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/16 10:06 AM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC, WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC (Richer, John) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
court
Certificate of Notice
Fri 07/13 9:37 AM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted Michael Riordan. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the Court. Scheduling Conference rescheduled for 8/16/2018 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 06/29 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 06/28/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/25 5:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC, WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC (Richer, John) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 06/25 9:57 AM
Summons Service Executed on MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC 5/29/2018. (Riordan, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 06/25 9:55 AM
Summons Service Executed on WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC 5/29/2018. (Riordan, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Setting Hearing
Tue 06/26 9:54 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Signed on 6/15/2018 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Thu 05/31 5:40 PM
Notice Of Appearance Under Fed. R. Bank. P. 9010(b), Request For All Copies Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002 And Request For All Pleadings Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3017(a) . Filed by EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO Services, Inc., Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Raider Marketing, LP (Larson, Michaela) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice
Wed 05/30 3:16 PM
Notice Of Appearance Under Fed. R. Bank. P. 9010(b), Request For All Copies Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002 And Request For All Pleadings Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3017(a) . Filed by EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO Services, Inc., Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Raider Marketing, LP (Riordan, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice
Wed 05/30 3:03 PM
Notice Of Appearance Under Fed. R. Bank. P. 9010(b), Request For All Copies Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002 And Request For All Pleadings Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3017(a) . Filed by EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO Services, Inc., Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Raider Marketing, LP (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/25 3:24 PM
Summons Issued on MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC Date Issued 5/25/2018. (than) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/25 3:22 PM
Summons Issued on WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC Date Issued 5/25/2018. (than) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 05/23 2:53 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Mockingbird Midstream Gas Services LLC. (Helt, Marcus) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 05/23 2:52 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Williams MLP Operating, LLC. (Helt, Marcus) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Tue 05/22 11:36 PM
Adversary case 18-03103 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint Original Complaint by EXCO Resources, Inc., EXCO GP Partners Old, LP, EXCO Holding (PA), Inc., EXCO Holding MLP, Inc., EXCO Land Company, LLC, EXCO Midcontinent MLP, LLC, EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Partners GP, LLC, EXCO Partners OLP GP, LLC, EXCO Production Company (PA), LLC, EXCO Production Company (WV), LLC, EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, EXCO Services, Inc., Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Raider Marketing, LP against WILLIAMS MLP OPERATING, LLC, MOCKINGBIRD MIDSTREAM GAS SERVICES, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Helt, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Williams Proof of Claim | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Williams RRC Motion | ||
Att: 3 Adversary Cover Sheet |