Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-24404

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:G Michael Halfenger
Case #: 2:18-ap-02118
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:May 22, 2018
Terminated:Jun 19, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wisconsin Auto Title Loan
8601 Dunwoody Place Suite 406
Atlanta, GA 30350
Represented By
Wisconsin Auto Title Loan
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela M Read
247 Sullivan Street, Apt. 404
Oshkosh, WI 54902
Represented By
John W. Menn
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, June 21, 2018
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/22 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 06/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Dismissing Case
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
6 6 order Dismissing Case Tue 06/19 9:06 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding(amb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 06/19 9:09 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:18-ap-2118 Order on Stipulation (amb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/19 9:11 AM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-2118 Closed (amb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
5 5 misc Proposed Order Mon 06/18 10:48 AM
Proposed Order RE:4 - Stipulation filed by Attorney John W. Menn of Steinhilber Swanson LLP on behalf of Angela M Read. (Menn, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation Mon 06/18 10:46 AM
Stipulation By Angela M Read and Wisconsin Auto Title Loans (through their counsel Atty J.D. Fichtner) to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Angela M Read Related [+] (Menn, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/23 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Angela M Read Related [+] (Menn, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read,2 Electronic Summons Issued
2 2 court Electronic Summons Issued Wed 05/23 1:27 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 6/22/2018. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 6/27/2018. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/30/2018 at 02:00 PM by Telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. (srh, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/22 4:15 PM
Adversary case 18-02118 Complaint by Angela M Read (attorney John W. Menn) against Wisconsin Auto Title Loan. Receipt Number WAIVED, Fee Amount $350 (72 (Injunctive relief - other),02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Menn, John)
Related: [-]