Yeager v. Binford et al (INMATE 2)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William Keith Watkins |
Referred: | Susan Russ Walker |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00526 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2019 |
Defendant
Billy Helms
|
|
Defendant
David Money
|
|
Defendant
Douglas Valeska
|
|
Defendant
Henry Binford
|
|
Defendant
Jackie Culpepper
|
|
Defendant
Joe Carroll
|
|
Defendant
Karen Scott
|
|
Defendant
Larry Doster
|
|
Defendant
Mark Culver
|
|
Defendant
Mark Saliba
|
|
Defendant
Patrick Jones
|
|
Defendant
Randy Helms
|
|
Interested Party
Staff Attorneys
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Allen Yeager
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 08/19 1:41 PM
ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/19/2019. (wcl, ) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss
Tue 08/06 9:17 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Allen Yeager. (kh, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Deadline
Mon 07/22 3:30 PM
ORDER: the 16 Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Court's Final Judgment Order is construed as a motion to reopen the time to appeal under Rule 4(a)(6) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure; it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Yeager's pro se 16 motion to reopen the time to appeal under Rule 4(a)(6) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure is GRANTED; (2) The time for Yeager to file a notice of appeal is reopened to and including 8/5/2019; and (3) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to include copies of the 14 Memorandum Opinion and Order adopting the Report and Recommendation and the 15 Final Judgment in the same mailing with this Order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/22/2019. (Copies mailed as directed) (wcl, ) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Response to Order
Thu 06/27 9:50 AM
Response to Order re17 Order,,, by Carrie Ellis McCollum.(McCollum, Carrie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
4
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/13 1:24 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 7/1/2019: (1) General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections shall contact appropriate officials at the Easterling Correctional Facility to determine if mail logs for incoming inmate legal mail for February 2019 and March 2019 at the Easterling Correctional Facility are available for submission to this court; and (2) General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections shall file a notice with the court advising of the results of the inquiry in paragraph (1) above; The notice should include copies of the legal mail logs as described herein if those logs are available; copy mailed to ALDOC General Counsel as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/13/2019. (wcl, ) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Set Aside Judgment
Mon 06/10 3:32 PM
MOTION to Set Aside/Vacate Court's15 Final Judgment Order by Richard Allen Yeager. (wcl, ) |
|
motion
Extension of Deadline
Mon 07/22 3:27 PM
MOTION to Reopen the Time to Appeal under Rule 4(a)(6) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure by Richard Allen Yeager, as construed in the court's19 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc16 for pdf) (wcl, ) |
||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Thu 02/14 2:33 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the prior proceedings and orders, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff and that Plaintiffs claims are dismissed with prejudice, except for Plaintiff's federal-law claims challenging his probation revocation and sentence of incarceration, which are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/14/2019.(kh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist | ||
14 | 14
9
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 02/14 2:30 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff's objections (Doc. # 13 ) are OVERRULED; (2) The Recommendation (Doc. # 10 ) is ADOPTED as modified herein;(3) Plaintiff's action against Circuit Judge Henry Binford is DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) & (iii);(4) Plaintiff's claims for damages against Douglas Valeska and Patrick Jones are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(iii);(5) Plaintiff's conspiracy claims against Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); and (6) Plaintiff's claims challenging his probation revocation and the resulting sentence on which he is presently incarcerated are DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as these claims are not properly before the court at this time.A separate Final Judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/14/2019. (kh, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 11/14 4:48 PM
OBJECTION to10 Report and Recommendations by Richard Allen Yeager.(dmn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 10/30 11:16 AM
ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 11 ) is GRANTED; and 2. Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension from October 24, 2018, to and including November 7, 2018, to file his objections. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/30/2018. (kh, ) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Deadline
Tue 10/30 9:33 AM
MOTION for Additional Time to Response to The Magistrate Judge Recommendation by Richard Allen Yeager. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/10 3:52 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1. Plaintiffs claims challenging events which occurred in March of 2016 be DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) because Plaintiff failed to file this action within the time prescribed by the applicable statute of limitations; 2. Plaintiffs complaint against Defendant Binford be DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) & (iii); 3. Plaintiffs complaint for damages against Defendants Valeska and Jones beDISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(iii); 4. Plaintiffs conspiracy claim against Defendants be DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); 5. Plaintiffs challenges to the constitutionality of his probation revocation in November 2017 and the resulting sentence on which he is presently incarcerated be DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as these claims are not properly before the court at this time; 6. This case be DISMISSED prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(iiii). Objections to R&R due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/10/2018. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/09 2:55 PM
ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's objections and a de novo review of those portions of the Recommendation to which Plaintiff objects, it is ORDERED that the objections (Doc. # 8 ) are OVERRULED. As correctly explained in the Recommendation, as a pro se litigant unschooled in the law, Plaintiff is not equipped to adequately protect and represent the legal interests of the veterans and military service members who would comprise the proposed class, and all relevant considerations weigh in favor of denying the motion for class certification. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/9/2018. (kh, ) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/02 3:23 PM
OBJECTION to6 Report and Recommendations by Richard Allen Yeager. (kh, ) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Certify Class Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/29 3:00 PM
ORDER : On June 8, 2018, the Magistrate Judge filed a Recommendation to which no timely objections have been filed. (Doc. # 6 .) Upon an independent review of the record and upon consideration of the Recommendation, it is ORDERED that the Recommendation is ADOPTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for class certification (Doc. # 4 ) is DENIED and that this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/29/2018. (kh, ) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 06/29 11:08 AM
No objections filed to the6 Recommendation. (No pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, ) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/08 11:24 AM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. Plaintiff's motion to certify case as a class action (Doc. 4 ) be DENIED; and 2. This case be referred to the undersigned for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/8/2018. (kh, ) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 06/06 10:06 AM
Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 4602049546 (kh, ) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Certify Class
Mon 06/04 4:08 PM
MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE ORDER by Richard Allen Yeager. (kh, ) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Fri 05/25 9:02 AM
ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $25.00 be paid on or before on or before June 11, 2018; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/25/2018. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit
Thu 05/24 5:01 PM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Richard Allen Yeager. (es, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Inmate 1983 Complaint
Thu 05/24 4:59 PM
Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Henry Binford, Joe Carroll, Jackie Culpepper, Mark Culver, Larry Doster, Billy Helms, Randy Helms, Patrick Jones, David Money, Mark Saliba, Karen Scott, Douglas Valeska, filed by Richard Allen Yeager.(es, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |