Green v. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45489 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 7:18-cv-00462 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:50 PM EST |
Defendant
Alabama CVS Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Malika Aryanpure
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Barnett, Jr
|
|
Defendant
James T Barnett, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mitt Larry Family Practice LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Christopher Green
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/11/2019 4:12 PM EDT |
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Par Pharmaceutical Inc from Tuscaloosa Circuit Court, case number 2018-900137., filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.(KAM, ) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Par Pharmaceutical Inc (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alabama CVS Pharmacy LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc.(Sydnor, James) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE by Alabama CVS Pharmacy LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc Notice of Consent to Removal (Sydnor, James) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/27/2018. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.(Bains, Lee) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - MDL Transfer Order | ||
7 | 7 TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Defendant Par Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Opposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint.6 In light of Plaintiff's opposition to the extension sought, this case is SET for a telephone status conference at 11:30 a.m. Central Time on Monday, April 2, 2018 . Defendants' obligations to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint are hereby EXTENDED until the completion of the conference and will be set by later order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/28/2018. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, ALND receipt#: B4601087825/ receipt_number 1126-3056255. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Par Pharmaceutical Inc from Tuscaloosa Circuit Court, case number 2018-900137., filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.(KAM, ). (Bains, Lee) Modified on 3/30/2018 (SAC, ). [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | ||
8 | 8 SUPPLEMENTAL TEXT ORDER: The court's previous Order (Docket Entry #7) setting a telephone conference for Monday, April 2, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. (CST) is AMENDED as follows: The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-434-5269 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/30/2018. (KLL) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 4/2/2018. A separate order will be entered by the court. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (KLL) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Walker on behalf of West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp (Walker, Thomas) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hansel Eli Lightner, II on behalf of West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp (Lightner, Hansel) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
11 | 11 TEXT ORDER -This case is before the court following the telephone status conference held on April 2, 2018. Pursuant to the court's directions on the record, it is hereby ORDERED as follows. On or before April 13, 2018 , the parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer about a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's anticipated motion to remand. On or before April 17, 2018 , the parties SHALL file a joint report discussing either their agreement on a proper briefing schedule or their respective positions on the appropriate briefing schedule. In that report, Plaintiff SHALL inform the court of the efforts made to perfect service on Defendants James T. Barnett, Jr. and James T. Barnett Jr., M.D., P.C. For good cause shown, Defendants' Opposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint6 is GRANTED . The court hereby EXTENDS the deadline for all Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until thirty (30) days after its ruling on the anticipated motion to remand. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/2/2018. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Summer A Wells on behalf of Norman Christopher Green (Wells, Summer) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman Christopher Green. James Barnett, Jr served on 4/12/2018, answer due 5/3/2018. (Brooks, Gerald) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
14 | 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman Christopher Green. James T Barnett, Jr served on 4/12/2018, answer due 5/3/2018. (Brooks, Gerald) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Alabama CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Sydnor, James) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
16 | 16 STATUS REPORT Joint by Par Pharmaceutical Inc. filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc(Bains, Lee) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER granting15 the parties' joint motion for entry of protective order; Because such materials are unavailable from other reasonable sources, the court hereby ORDERS that they be produced in response to a valid subpoena or other legal process. This Order further PERMITS the taking and preservation of testimony that may be necessary to establish a chain of custody or other predicate for admission of evidence. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/18/2018. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Northern Ohio. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 4/27/2018.] | |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 7:18-cv-00462. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |