City of Newport, Rhode Island v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45479 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Rhode Island, 1:18-cv-00156 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:52 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180 |
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Newport, Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:12 PM EDT |
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1195056 ), filed by City of Newport, Rhode Island.(Mancuso, Eva) [Transferred from rid on 4/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from rid on 4/27/2018.] | ||
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Archie C. Lamb, Jr.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/27/2018. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from rid on 4/27/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from rid on 4/27/2018.] | |
3 | 3 MOTION for Archie C. Lamb, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1195535 ) filed by City of Newport, Rhode Island. (Mancuso, Eva) [Transferred from rid on 4/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-21): Transferring this matter to the Northern District of OH and assignment to Judge Polster for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. So Ordered by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/16/2018. (Jackson, Ryan) [Transferred from rid on 4/27/2018.] | |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Rhode Island. Case number 1:18-cv-00156. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |