Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:18-bk-14705

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Wendelin I Lipp
Case #: 0:18-ap-00183
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 25, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Robert D. Wagman, Defendant
Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC 1390 Piccard Street Suite 315
Rockville, MD 20850
Represented By
Robert D. Wagman
contact info
Defendant
Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC, Defendant
1390 Piccard Street Suite 315
Rockville, MD 20850
Represented By
Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant
21301 Civic Center Drive
Southfield, MI 48076
Represented By
Credit Acceptance Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Michelle Lo, Defendant
Empire Auto Parts, Inc. 10 N. Calvert Street Suite 100
Baltimore, MD 20763
Represented By
Michelle Lo
contact info
Defendant
Empire Auto Parts, Inc., Defendant
8870 Greenwood Place
Savage, MD 20763
Represented By
Empire Auto Parts, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry M. Ramirez, Plaintiff
8804 62nd Avenue
College Park, MD 20740
Represented By
Douglas N. Gottron
Morris Palerm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/13 10:34 AM
Adversary Case 0:18-ap-183 Closed. (McKenna, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
28 28 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/12 6:20 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Henry M. Ramirez. (Gottron, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
27 27 apmisc Status Letter/Report Wed 02/27 5:06 PM
Status Letter/Report submitted on behalf of Plaintiff/Debtor Henry M. Ramirez Filed by Douglas N. Gottron. (Gottron, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
26 26 apmisc Certificate of Service Wed 02/13 3:44 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Empire Auto Parts, Inc.'s Response to Requests for Production of Documents from Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC Filed by Daniel M. Kennedy III Related [+]. (Kennedy, Daniel)
Related: [-] 23 Notice of Service filed by Defendant Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC
Friday, January 25, 2019
25 25 apmisc Certificate of Service Fri 01/25 3:00 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Empire Auto Parts, Inc.'s Answers to Interrogatories from Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC Filed by Daniel M. Kennedy III Related [+]. (Kennedy, Daniel)
Related: [-] 23 Notice of Service filed by Defendant Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC
Friday, January 18, 2019
24 24 apmisc Certificate of Service Fri 01/18 4:08 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Discovery Propounded Filed by Daniel M. Kennedy III. (Kennedy, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 22, 2018
court ADI process Return Mail Sat 12/22 10:10 AM
Returned Mail: mail sent via USPS was returned as undeliverable for the following: Mailed on 12/02/2018 a notice RE: TO Michelle Lo Empire Auto Parts, Inc. 10 N. Calvert Street Suite 100 Baltimore, MD 21202-1813. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
23 23 notice Notice of Service Thu 12/13 10:42 AM
Notice of Service regarding Discovery Materials to Defendants Empire Auto Parts, Inc. and Michelle Lo. Filed by Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC. (Wagman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
22 22 apmisc Certificate of Service Tue 12/11 4:00 PM
Certificate of Service of Discovery Materials to Plaintiff Henry Ramirez Filed by Robert D. Wagman. (Wagman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 02, 2018
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/03 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 12/02/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Friday, November 30, 2018
20 20 court Returned Mail Notice to Party Fri 11/30 1:53 PM
Notice of returned mail to a party, Michelle Lo (dft), in this case. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
court ADI process Return Mail Thu 11/29 10:10 AM
Returned Mail: mail sent via USPS was returned as undeliverable for the following: Mailed on 11/02/2018 a notice RE: Scheduling Order TO Michelle Lo Empire Auto Parts, Inc. 10 N. Calvert Street Suite 100 Baltimore, MD 21202-1813. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 02, 2018
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 11/03 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 11/02/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/31 2:29 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Empire Auto Parts, Inc., Michelle Lo. (Kennedy, Daniel)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/31 1:58 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Expert Witness and Reports due by 1/28/2019. Discovery due by 2/27/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2019. Status Letters due by 2/27/2019. Exhibit List, Exhibits, and List of Witnesses due by 3/25/2019. Written Objections to Exhibits due by 4/8/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3-C, Greenbelt - Judge Lipp. Pre-Trial Memoranda due by 4/8/2019. Trial date set for 4/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3-C, Greenbelt - Judge Lipp. (McKenna, Shannon)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Henry M. Ramirez,4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation,5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC,6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Robert D. Wagman
Monday, October 15, 2018
16 16 court Hearing Held Wed 10/17 2:37 PM
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HEL Related [+]. SCHEDULING ORDER TO BE PREPARED BY THE COURT. (Ward, Sophia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Henry M. Ramirez,4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation,5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC,6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Robert D. Wagman
Friday, October 12, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/13 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Court Instruction
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
14 14 court Court Instruction Wed 10/10 2:38 PM
Court Instruction - MOTION MUST PROVIDE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR CONSENT ORDER SIGNED BY ALL PARTIES WHO HAVE APPEARED, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 7041. Related [+]. (McKenna, Shannon)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Plaintiff Henry M. Ramirez
Thursday, September 13, 2018
12 12 motion Dismiss Party Thu 09/13 8:40 PM
Motion to Dismiss Party Robert D. Wagman, Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC, and Credit Acceptance Corporation Filed by Henry M. Ramirez. (Gottron, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
13 13 court Hearing Continued Fri 09/14 10:31 AM
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD AND CONTINUED Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3-C, Greenbelt - Judge Lipp. (Ward, Sophia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Henry M. Ramirez,4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation,5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC,6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Robert D. Wagman
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/12 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Summons Issued
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
10 10 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Tue 07/10 5:56 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Empire Auto Parts, Inc. 7/10/2018; Michelle Lo 7/10/2018. (Gottron, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 through 2
Monday, July 09, 2018
9 9 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Mon 07/09 5:02 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Credit Acceptance Corporation 6/1/2018; Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC 6/1/2018; Robert D. Wagman 6/1/2018. (Gottron, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 through 2
8 8 court Summons Issued Mon 07/09 3:42 PM
SUMMONS REISSUED on Empire Auto Parts, Inc. Date Issued 7/9/2018, Answer Due 8/8/2018; Michelle Lo Date Issued 7/9/2018, Answer Due 8/8/2018 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3-C, Greenbelt - Judge Lipp. (Ward, Sophia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Henry M. Ramirez
Thursday, July 05, 2018
7 7 apmisc Line Thu 07/05 4:19 PM
Line Requesting Reissuance of Summons as to Defendants Michelle Lo and Empire Auto Parts, Inc. Filed by Douglas N. Gottron Related [+]. (Gottron, Douglas)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, June 29, 2018
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/29 11:21 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Robert D. Wagman. (Wagman, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/29 11:20 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC. (Wagman, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/29 11:15 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Wagman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 02, 2018
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/03 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/02/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, May 31, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 05/31 4:32 PM
Summons Issued on Credit Acceptance Corporation Date Issued 5/31/2018, Answer Due 7/2/2018; Empire Auto Parts, Inc. Date Issued 5/31/2018, Answer Due 7/2/2018; Michelle Lo Date Issued 5/31/2018, Answer Due 7/2/2018; Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC Date Issued 5/31/2018, Answer Due 7/2/2018; Robert D. Wagman Date Issued 5/31/2018, Answer Due 7/2/2018 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3-C, Greenbelt - Judge Lipp. (Ward, Sophia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Henry M. Ramirez
Friday, May 25, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/25 11:20 PM
Adversary case 18-00183 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Douglas N. Gottron on behalf of Henry M. Ramirez against Robert D. Wagman, Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Michelle Lo, Empire Auto Parts, Inc.. The filing fee is EXEMPT - Plaintiff is the debtor in the Bankruptcy case. (Gottron, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 through 2
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet