Udd v. Phoenix, City of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Dominic W Lanza |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01616 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 25, 2018 1:27 AM MST |
Defendant
Phoenix, City of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mary Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darren Udd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Udd
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Unknown Roberts
Terminated: 06/11/2018
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 09, 2022 | ||
241 | 241
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 03/11 3:42 PM
MANDATE of USCA re:239 Notice of Appeal filed by Amy Udd, Darren Udd. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (Docket Entry No. 6), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (BAC) |