Holder v. Balwdin-Cox Agency, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40735
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40735
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mark X Mullin |
Case #: | 4:18-ap-04114 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Balwdin-Cox Agency, LLC
5930 Preston View Blvd, Suite 200
Dallas, TX 75240 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Areya Holder
Law Office of Areya Holder, P.C 901 Main Street, Suite 5320
Dallas, TX 75202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:09 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding
Tue 01/22 10:11 AM
Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Areya Holder. (Purcell, Bradley) |
|
court
Close adversary case
Tue 01/22 2:51 PM
Adversary case 4:18-ap-4114 closed (Calfee, J.) |
||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Clerk's correspondence
Fri 01/04 2:24 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. (Ward, J) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing not held
Tue 11/20 9:08 AM
Hearing NOT held on 11/20/2018. ***NOTICE OF DISMISSAL TO BE FILED*** (Rueter, Karyn) |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons service executed
Wed 06/06 2:39 PM
Summons service executed on Baldwin-Cox Agency, LLC 6/5/2018 (Purcell, Bradley) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons issued
Thu 05/31 11:25 AM
Summons issued on Baldwin-Cox Agency, LLC Answer Due 7/2/2018 (Calfee, J.) |
|
3 | 3
order
Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Thu 05/31 11:22 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM at Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm.. Entered on 5/31/2018 (Calfee, J.) |
|
2 | 2
order
Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Thu 05/31 11:15 AM
INCORRECT ENTRY: Defendants name was misspelled. Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM at Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm.. Entered on 5/31/2018 (Calfee, J.) Modified on 5/31/2018 (Calfee, J.) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/30 9:47 AM
Adversary case 18-04114 Complaint by Areya Holder, Balwdin-Cox Agency, LLC against Balwdin-Cox Agency, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 . 13. (Purcell, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |