LEVKUS v. MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joy Flowers Conti |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00713 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 25, 2018 3:17 AM EST |
Defendant
MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BELVIA LEVKUS
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Mediator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
Terminated: 10/11/2018
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 27 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re 18 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/27/18. (mh) |
Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order
Tue 10/30 1:05 PM
ORDER re32 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by BELVIA LEVKUS. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal the case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/30/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (smc) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 10/29 9:25 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by BELVIA LEVKUS. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Statistical Case Closing
Tue 10/16 11:02 AM
ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. The court has been advised that the above-captioned action has been settled and that the only matter remaining to be completed is submission of a stipulation for dismissal under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). It appears that there is no further action required by the court at this time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk mark the above-captioned case closed; that nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action, and that should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, either party may initiate the same in the same manner as if this order had not been entered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including but not limited to enforcing settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/16/2018. (smc) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
adr
Report of Mediation
Thu 10/11 4:27 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has been resolved. SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI terminated. Attorney Sally G. Cimini terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 10/4/2018. (Cimini, Sally) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
adr
Notice of Mediation
Mon 10/01 9:04 AM
Notice of Mediation by BELVIA LEVKUS. Mediation Date October 4, 2018 at 10:00a.m. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Wed 09/26 11:58 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Sally Griffith Cimini is appointed as mediator. Party SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI added. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/26/2018. (smc) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/26 11:56 AM
ORDER IMPLEMENTING FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(D). Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/26/2018. (smc) |
|
26 | 26
order
Case Management Order
Wed 09/26 11:55 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 3/4/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/26/2018. (smc) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
minutes
Initial Case Management Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 09/21 5:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2018, (Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti.) Court held case management conference and court discussed ESI issues. Motion is required to amend the pleadings. Parties will file a confidentiality agreement. Attorney Nicholas Pahuta to file notice of date, time and location of mediation by 10/5/2018. Post-discovery status conference set for 3/12/2018. Case management, 502(d) Clawback and ADR orders to follow. All as more fully stated on the record (Court Reporter: Sandy Wenger) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (msp) |
||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/14 4:26 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint (Third Amended Complaint) by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Koop, Katherine) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion) Do NOT use for amended complaint
Fri 09/07 12:34 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BELVIA LEVKUS. Amendment to23 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Fri 09/07 12:21 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re23 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. ERROR: Wrong version of form used for document. CORRECTION: Counsel is advised the Stipulation Selecting ADR form has been updated. Dispose of all previous versions of the Stipulation and begin using the amended form, with the revision date 4/2017. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv) |
||
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Stipulation Selecting ADR process
Thu 09/06 3:47 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by BELVIA LEVKUS. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 09/04 3:29 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/31 3:21 PM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ; MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC. answer due 9/14/2018, filed by BELVIA LEVKUS. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/28 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Albert S. Lee on behalf of MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Lee, Albert) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
6
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion & Order
Mon 08/27 3:12 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re18 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/27/18. (mh) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 08/27 3:11 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/27/18. (mh) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Sur-Reply Brief
Fri 08/17 5:19 PM
Sur-Reply Brief filed by BELVIA LEVKUS. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Response/Briefing Schedule
Mon 08/06 1:31 PM
ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re15 Reply Brief Plaintiff's sur-reply brief shall be due by 8/17/2018. The sur-reply shall be limited to new issues raised in defendant's reply brief and shall not exceed five pages. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/3/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mh) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply Brief
Fri 08/03 2:26 PM
REPLY BRIEF re10 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Koop, Katherine) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order
Thu 08/02 4:07 PM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/RULE26-F-20161101.pdf and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/ADRSTIP-FEB2014_w_0.pdfdue by 9/6/2018. Case Management set for 9/21/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti. All counsel and unrepresented parties shall bring their calendars to the conference for scheduling purposes. The parties should be prepared to discuss settlement, the designation of an Alternative Dispute Resolution process and any other matter that will contribute to the prompt disposition of the case. The parties shall be prepared to address and argue all pending motions at the scheduling conference. Any party filing a motion prior to the scheduling conference to which a response is required but not filed shall file a motion for a continuance of the scheduling conference until the response is due. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/2/2018. (smc) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 07/26 1:25 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file its Reply on or before 8/3/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/26/2018. (smc) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File
Wed 07/25 2:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to File REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNCONTESTED MOTION) by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Koop, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/25 1:14 PM
STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation) by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (Koop, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Tue 07/17 5:16 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BELVIA LEVKUS. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 07/17 5:15 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BELVIA LEVKUS. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 06/26 3:44 PM
BRIEF in Support re7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Koop, Katherine) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 06/26 3:43 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Koop, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/12 9:55 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT linked to Notice of Removal against MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ;, filed by BELVIA LEVKUS. (Pahuta, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/01 4:33 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC. Answer due from MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC. on 6/22/2018. (Koop, Katherine) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Fri 06/01 11:10 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Koop, Katherine) |
|
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/01 10:25 AM
ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/1/2018. (smc) |
|
2 | 2
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Fri 06/01 10:22 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/30 1:52 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 6/6/2018. (jv) |
||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Wed 05/30 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number Gd-18-004506 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4743072), filed by MED HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (jv) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Including Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Including Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D |