California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:18-cv-04784
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:May 30, 2018
Terminated:Dec 18, 2018
Last checked: Monday Nov 26, 2018 1:37 AM PST
Defendant
Peter Beckett
Represented By
Evan Seth Cohen
Cohen And Cohen
contact info
Bridget Byrnes Hirsch
Anderson Kill LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronn Moss
Represented By
David W Swift
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump And Aldisert LLP
contact info
Gregory Philip Korn
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump And Aldisert LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
32 32 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Wed 12/19 1:33 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
31 31 judgmentCV Judgment Wed 12/19 1:30 PM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, Related to: Stipulation for Judgment29 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT: A. The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter in this dispute and the parties herein. Venue is proper in this Judicial District. The Court finds that there is a factual and legal basis for entry of this Judgment and for the enforceability of this Judgment as set forth herein. (See document for details). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
Related: [-]
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 12/18 1:28 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court, having received the Stipulation for Judgment29 , vacates all pending dates. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
29 29 stip Judgment Tue 11/27 11:07 AM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to Settlement Between the Parties filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss.(Swift, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulated Judgment
Friday, October 05, 2018
28 28 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Fri 10/05 3:10 PM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 10/03 11:57 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition19 filed by Defendant Peter Beckett.(Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 24, 2018
26 26 order Dismiss Case Mon 09/24 2:40 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS21 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Defendant's motion to dismiss the FAC for the failure to state a claim and for lack of jurisdiction is DENIED. Defendant is given 10 days from the date of this Order to file an answer to the FAC. Jury Trial is set for January 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m., with a Pretrial Conference on January 14, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
25 25 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 09/14 9:19 AM
IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:21 MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) filed by defendant - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 31, 2018
24 24 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 08/31 9:52 AM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) 21 filed by Defendant Peter Beckett. (Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 27, 2018
23 23 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 08/27 12:56 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) 21 filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss. (Korn, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 08/06 9:33 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint)21 - Hearing on the motion previously scheduled for 09/10/2018 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled to 9/17/2018 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
21 21 motion Dismiss Case Fri 08/03 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) filed by defendant Peter Beckett. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 07/25 3:31 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - In light of the First Amended Complaint being filed on 7/23/2018, the Motion to Dismiss17 scheduled for 8/13/2018 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 23, 2018
19 19 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 07/23 11:39 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Ronn Moss amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss(Swift, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
18 18 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 07/16 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Peter Beckett, (Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Case Mon 07/16 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Peter Beckett. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attorney Bridget Byrnes Hirsch added to party Peter Beckett(pty:dft)) (Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 12, 2018
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 07/12 9:21 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Order to Show Cause, issued on 7/3/2018, is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 07/09 2:01 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Peter Beckett answer now due 7/16/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss.(Korn, Gregory)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Response Mon 07/09 1:50 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ronn Mossto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines13 Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution (Korn, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/03 4:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 7/10/2018.) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 06/07 11:42 AM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss, upon Defendant Peter Beckett served on 6/3/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 06/01 1:23 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 31, 2018
10 10 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 05/31 11:29 AM
AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss. (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 05/31 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is Incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/31 10:52 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Peter Beckett. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 05/31 10:37 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 05/31 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Wed 05/30 3:19 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Ronn Moss. (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/30 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss, (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 05/30 3:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss. (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 05/30 3:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss. (Swift, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/30 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21839174 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ronn Moss. (Attorney David W Swift added to party Ronn Moss(pty:pla))(Swift, David)
Related: [-]