County of Mariposa, et al v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45618 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 1:18-cv-00626 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:54 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Company
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Mariposa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/15/2019 12:54 PM EDT |
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 320 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants by County of Mariposa, California. Attorney Fiske, John Paul added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7646566)(Fiske, John) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Paul Fiske* *Baron & Budd, P.C.* *603 North Coast Highway, Suite G* *Solana Beach, CA 92075*. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
3 | 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Paul Fiske* *Baron & Budd, P.C.* *603 North Coast Highway, Suite G* *Solana Beach, CA 92075*. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
4 | 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Paul Fiske* *Baron & Budd, P.C.* *603 North Coast Highway, Suite G* *Solana Beach, CA 92075*. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
5 | 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Paul Fiske* *Baron & Budd, P.C.* *603 North Coast Highway, Suite G* *Solana Beach, CA 92075*. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., The Kroger Co., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Paul Fiske* *Baron & Budd, P.C.* *603 North Coast Highway, Suite G* *Solana Beach, CA 92075*. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Thrifty Payless, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Paul Fiske* *Baron & Budd, P.C.* *603 North Coast Highway, Suite G* *Solana Beach, CA 92075*. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
8 | 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER of Recusal and Vacating Scheduling Conference Date signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/08/2018. New Case Number: 1:18-cv-626 LJO-SKO.(Flores, E) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER of Recusal signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/10/2018. New Case Number is 1:18-cv-626 LJO-SAB.(Flores, E) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-31). CASE TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Ohio. MDL No. 2804. (Robles, S) [Transferred from caed on 5/30/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Eastern. Case number 1:18-cv-00626. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |