Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.58.223.110
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Goldsmith |
Referred: | Stephanie Dawkins Davis |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-11726 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 27, 2018 4:31 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.58.223.110
|
|
Defendant
Adam Sala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malibu Media, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report
Mon 12/03 9:43 AM
Copyright Report Sent To Washington (SSch) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order
Mon 11/26 10:38 AM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/21 10:49 AM
ORDER Striking Stipulation (Dkt. 16). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/21 10:10 AM
[STRICKEN] STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) Modified on 11/21/2018 (Sandusky, K) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 11/15 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/15/2018. (Sandusky, K) |
||
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/14 3:34 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (TIME CHANGE ONLY) Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. (Sandusky, K) |
||
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 11/08 1:00 PM
NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/30 10:42 AM
ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith ). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/16 3:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Adam Sala. (Lipp, Anne) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Thu 09/27 4:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Adam Sala served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued*
Thu 09/20 8:46 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Adam Sala* (DWor) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
Wed 09/19 5:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Malibu Media, LLC against Adam Sala. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
service
Request for Additional Summons
Wed 09/19 5:40 PM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for Adam Sala. (Bernier, Joel) |
||
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 09/07 3:02 PM
ORDER on Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time within which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend - free
Wed 08/29 12:50 PM
MOTION TO EXTEND extension of time to serve defendant with summons and amended complaint by Malibu Media, LLC. (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report
Mon 06/11 4:04 PM
Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
notice
Error
Mon 06/04 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Joel A. Bernier. Form AO 121 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch) |
||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion - Free
Fri 06/01 4:37 PM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/01 1:18 PM
ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Fri 06/01 9:14 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (ATee) |
||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Thu 05/31 6:08 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
3 | 3
respm
Supplemental Brief
Thu 05/31 6:07 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re2 MOTION for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion - Free
Thu 05/31 6:00 PM
MOTION for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Bernier, Joel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Thu 05/31 5:58 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.58.223.110 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-6755148 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Los Angeles - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B |