Harris N.A. v. Loren W. Hershey
Original Case: 1:09-cv-06661
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:11-cv-01550 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2011 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2013 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2016 5:53 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
ACADIA INVESTMENTS L.C.
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
LOREN WALTER HERSHEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
HARRIS N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/13/2016 4:44 AM CST |
Wednesday, March 09, 2011 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Acadia Investments L.C. and Appellant Loren W. Hershey by 03/16/2011. Transcript information sheet due by 03/23/2011. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/18/2011 for Acadia Investments L.C. and Loren W. Hershey. Record on Appeal from Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division due by 03/30/2011. [1] [6292559] 11-1550 (CD) |