Caruso v. Modany et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50100 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kevin Modany
13158 Sherbern Dr. W.
Carmel, IN 46032 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John E. Dean
4742 Sailors Retread Rd.
Oxford, MD 21654 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
C. David Brown, II
35 Rancho San Carlos Rd.
Carmel, CA 93923 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joanna T. Lau
71 Eugenia Ave.
Kiawah Island, SC 29455 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas I. Morgan
30541 Carney Creek Road
Bigfork, MT 59911 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Vincent Weber
7701 Ridgecrest Drive
Alexandria, VA 22308 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John F. Cozzi
32 Washington Sq. W. Apt. 10W
New York, NY 10011 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samuel L. Odle
240 East 70th St.
Indianapolis, IN 46220 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jerry M. Cohen
9 Claridge Circle
Manhasset, NY 11030 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
96 | 96
misc
Withdrawal as Attorney, Notice of
Fri 06/02 11:10 AM
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney filed by Paul D. Vink on behalf of Defendants C. David Brown II, Jerry M. Cohen, John F. Cozzi, John E. Dean, Joanna T. Lau, Thomas I. Morgan, Samuel L. Odle, John Vincent Weber. (Vink, Paul) |
|
95 | 95
misc
Withdrawal as Attorney, Notice of
Fri 06/02 10:35 AM
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney filed by Vilda Samuel Laurin III on behalf of Defendants C. David Brown II, Jerry M. Cohen, John F. Cozzi, John E. Dean, Joanna T. Lau, Thomas I. Morgan, Samuel L. Odle, John Vincent Weber. (Laurin, Vilda) |
|
94 | 94
misc
Withdrawal as Attorney, Notice of
Fri 06/02 10:33 AM
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney filed by Gregory Forrest Hahn on behalf of Defendants C. David Brown II, Jerry M. Cohen, John F. Cozzi, John E. Dean, Joanna T. Lau, Thomas I. Morgan, Samuel L. Odle, John Vincent Weber. (Hahn, Gregory) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
93 | 93
misc
Withdrawal as Attorney, Notice of
Fri 05/26 5:31 PM
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Defendants C. David Brown II, Jerry M. Cohen, John F. Cozzi, John E. Dean, Joanna T. Lau, Thomas I. Morgan, Samuel L. Odle, John Vincent Weber. (Moloy, James) |