Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 8:18-bk-04599
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2018
Terminated:Aug 10, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Jan 27, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Purple Shovel, LLC
PO Box 18132
Tampa, FL 33679-8132
Represented By
Sheila D Norman
Law Offices Of Norman And Bullington
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Benjamin E. Lambers
Timberlake Annex
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, August 22, 2022
454 454 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 08/22 3:45 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2022 Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Trustee Gerard A. McHale Jr.. (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents