Feldman v. Stryker Corporation et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01416 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 28, 2018 2:32 AM CST |
Defendant
Howmedica Osteonics
325 Corporate Blvd.
Mahwah, NJ 07430 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
aap Biomaterials GmbH
|
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Feldman
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Stryker Corporation
Terminated: 08/22/2018
2825 Airview Blvd.
Portage, MI 49002 |
|
Defendant
aap Implantate AG
Terminated: 09/18/2018
|
|
Defendant
aap Implants Inc
Terminated: 09/18/2018
Incorporating Services Ltd. 3500 S. Dupont Highway
Dover, DE 19901 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, August 23, 2021 | ||
198 | 198
misc
Stipulation
Mon 08/23 4:06 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Rebecca Feldman. (Cook, Wesley) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Tue 08/24 1:10 PM
Civil Case Terminated per198 Stipulation of Dismissal. (ndt) |
||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
197 | 197
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Produce
Mon 08/16 11:18 AM
ORDER: This Order addresses Plaintiff Rebecca Feldman's Motion to Enforce Prior Order ("Motion") [ECF No.178 ]. Having reviewed the Motion, Defendant Howmedica Osteonics Corporation's ("HOC") Opposition [ECF No.183 ], Plaintiff's Reply [ECF No.188 ], and HOC's Sur-reply [ECF No.191 ], and the documents filed in support thereof, the Court DENIES the Motion. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/16/2021) (ctf) |