California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:18-cv-04905
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2018
Terminated:Mar 07, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 28, 2018 1:14 AM PST
Defendant
FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By
Linda N Bollinger
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Sandra C Isom
Fedex Freight Inc
contact info
Keith A Jacoby
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Sophia Behnia
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jonathan Mamuyac
Represented By
Caspar S Jivalagian
Kjt Law Group LLP
contact info
Christopher A Adams
Lightgabler LLP
contact info
Vache A Thomassian
Kjt Law Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 07, 2019
23 23 order Dismissing Case Fri 03/08 11:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF PRE-CERTIFICATION CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))20 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 03/06 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Pre-Certification Class Action Lawsuit re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))20(Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Pre-Certification of Class Action Lawsuit
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 03/06 8:58 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE - The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 3/7/2019 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled to 3/18/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 02/25 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. Dismissal is With Prejudice as to Plaintiff. (Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 11/28 11:39 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 12/3/2018 at 3:00 PM has been rescheduled to 3/7/2019 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
18 18 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/26 12:05 PM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Submit Motion for Class Certification17 . The Court orders the following: Deadline for Plaintiff to file his motion for class certification shall be 1/15/19; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
17 17 stip Extension of Time to File Document Fri 10/19 5:16 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Submit Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc..(Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 28, 2018
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 09/28 4:51 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Counsel are hereby notified that the Status Conference currently scheduled for 10/1/18, is hereby ordered continued to 12/03/18 at 1:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ys)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Thu 08/23 1:50 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO SUBMIT MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File13 . (Motions due by 11/5/2018.) Related [+] (mrgo)
Related: [-] sponses due by 11/13/2018, Replies due by 11/20/2018.
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
14 14 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 08/21 4:29 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File [13-1]. The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
13 13 stip Extension of Time to File Document Mon 08/20 3:19 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Mamuyac.(Jivalagian, Caspar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 13, 2018
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/13 11:14 AM
NOTICE Defendant's Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
11 11 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 06/28 4:01 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 7/2/2018 at 3:00 PM is rescheduled to 10/1/2018 at 01:30 PM. Plaintiffs are ordered to file a motion for class certification in 60 days. The hearing for the motion will also be scheduled for October 1, 2018 at 1:30 PM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
10 10 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 06/25 11:26 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Joint Rule Report; [Proposed] Order ; estimated length of trial 4-5 weeks, filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc... (Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 06/08 10:54 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/2/2018 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 06/08 10:37 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 06/06 11:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 , Declaration,4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 Certificate of Service with Exhibit A (Filed-Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court served on June 6, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 06/04 3:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 06/04 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 06/01 4:38 PM
DECLARATION of Elizabeth Powell re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Declaration of Elizabeth Powell in support of Defendant's Notice to Federal Court of Removal of Civil Action from State Court 28 U.S.C. Section 1332(d)(2) CAFA filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/01 4:31 PM
Defendant's Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc., identifying FedEx Freight Corporation. (Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 06/01 4:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/01 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC702287 Receipt No: 0973-21857557 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Attorney Linda N Bollinger added to party FedEx Freight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bollinger, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Answer
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 06/04 1:26 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-20, inclusive, FedEx Freight, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Jonathan Mamuyac. Filed in State Court 5/1/18 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 06/04 1:29 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc. Filed in State Court on 5/31/18 Submitted with attachment 2 to notice of removal1 .(car)
Related: [-]