California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:18-cr-02179
Case Filed:May 03, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Jun 02, 2018 12:39 AM PDT
Defendant
Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Jeremy Delicino
Jeremy Delicino LLC
contact info
Material Witness
Fidencio Camarillo-Lopez
Represented By
Marissa L Walter
Walter Legal
contact info
Material Witness
Alfredo Catarino-Cabello
Represented By
Marissa L Walter
Walter Legal
contact info
Material Witness
David Fernando Gaspar-Rodriguez
Represented By
Marissa L Walter
Walter Legal
contact info
Material Witness
Eugenio Hernandez-Dominguez
Represented By
Marissa L Walter
Walter Legal
contact info
Material Witness
Raul Hernandez-Dominguez
Represented By
Marissa L Walter
Walter Legal
contact info
Material Witness
Martin Jimenez-Enriquez
Represented By
Marissa L Walter
Walter Legal
contact info
Material Witness
Manuel Viviano-Martinez
Represented By
Marissa L Walter
Walter Legal
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Michael Alexander
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Aug 31 2018
JUDGMENT as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1), Count(s) 1, 3-7, Government oral motion to dismiss remaining counts without prejudice - granted.; Count(s) 2, Committed to custody of BOP for term of 12 months and one (1) day. Supervised release of three (3) years to follow. Special assessment of $100.00 imposed. JVTA assessment of $5,000.00 is waived/defendant deemed indigent. No fine. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo (anh) (jao).
GPO Sep 16 2019
Revocation of Supervised Release/Probation Judgment and Commitment as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1), SUPERVISED RELEASE REVOKED AND REIMPOSED 9/13/2019 - Committed to custody of BOP for Time Served (38 days). Supervised release continued for two (2) years. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (anh)
GPO Feb 19 2021
Revocation of Supervised Release/Probation Judgment and Commitment as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1),. SUPERVISED RELEASE REVOKED AND REIMPOSED 2/19/2021 - Committed to custody of BOP for three (3) months. Supervised Release reimposed for one (1) year.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (anh)
GPO Nov 01 2021
Revocation of Supervised Release/Probation Judgment and Commitment as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1), SUPERVISED RELEASE REVOKED AND REIMPOSED 10/29/2021 - Committed to custody of BOP for seven (7) months. No supervised release to follow. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (anh)

Docket last updated: 06/02/2018 1:10 AM PDT
Friday, April 06, 2018
Arrest of Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (no document attached) (lrf) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 4/9/2018 in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/19/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. Arraignment set for 5/3/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis.(lrf) (sjt). [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (jms) (jao). [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis: Initial Appearance as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez held on 4/9/2018. Appointed Attorney Marissa L Walter for Manuel Viviano-Martinez, Manuel Viviano-Martinez, Martin Jimenez-Enriquez, Martin Jimenez-Enriquez, Raul Hernandez-Dominguez, Raul Hernandez-Dominguez, Eugenio Hernandez-Dominguez, Eugenio Hernandez-Dominguez, David Fernando Gaspar-Rodriguez, David Fernando Gaspar-Rodriguez, Alfredo Catarino-Cabello, Fidencio Camarillo-Lopez, Fidencio Camarillo-Lopez. Appointed Attorney Jeremy Delicino for Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez. Bond set as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1) $30,000.00 C/CS, exam of sureties. Preliminary Hearing set for 04/19/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. Arraignment set for 05/03/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. Arraignment of Material Witness Manuel Viviano-Martinez, Martin Jimenez-Enriquez, Raul Hernandez-Dominguez, Eugenio Hernandez-Dominguez, David Fernando Gaspar-Rodriguez, Fidencio Camarillo-Lopez held on 4/9/2018. Material Witness bail set at $5,000.00 P/S w/10 percent cash deposit. M/W must be able to legally remain in the U.S. and follow PTS supervision. (Interpreter Letty Lewis). (CD# 4/9/2018 PCL 3:11-3:21 & 3:45-3:53). (Plaintiff Attorney Michael Kaplan, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell, FD). (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (no document attached) (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
5 5 PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER. Bond set for Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1) $30,000 C/CS, surety exam. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 4/9/2018. (srm) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
6 6 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez: Arraignment of MW set for 4/11/2018 before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (no document attached) (dxj) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
7 7 **Document Withdrawn** NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ryan Robert Crosswell appearing for USA. (Crosswell, Ryan)Attorney Ryan Robert Crosswell added to party USA(pty:pla) (jms). [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Withdraw Document7 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA by USA as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez. (Crosswell, Ryan)(jms). [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christopher Michael Alexander appearing for USA. (Alexander, Christopher)Attorney Christopher Michael Alexander added to party USA(pty:pla)(jms). [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/17/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (no document attached) (erf) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis: Arraignment of Material Witness Alfredo Catarino-Cabello held on 4/11/2018. Material Witness bail set at $5,000.00 P/S w/10% percent cash deposit, M/W must be able to legally remain in the U.S. and follow Pretrial Trial supervision. (Interpreter Lorena Fiallo). (CD# 4/11/2018 PCL:01-3:28-3:30). (Plaintiff Attorney Davis Loop). (no document attached) (tar) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
12 12 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (Delicino, Jeremy)(jms). [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
13 13 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Fidencio Camarillo-Lopez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000.00 P/S with 10% deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 04/16/18. (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Alfredo Catarino-Cabello. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000.00 P/S with 10% deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 04/16/18. (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to David Fernando Gaspar-Rodriguez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000.00 P/S with 10% deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 04/16/18. (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Eugenio Hernandez-Dominguez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000.00 P/S with 10% deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 04/16/18. (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Raul Hernandez-Dominguez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000.00 P/S with 10% deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 04/16/18. (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Martin Jimenez-Enriquez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000.00 P/S with 10% deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 04/16/18. (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Manuel Viviano-Martinez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000.00 P/S with 10% deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 04/16/18. (ccc) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis: Preliminary Hearing Continued as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 5/3/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (Interpreter Ana Reyna). (CD# 4/17/2018 PCL 1: 2:54 - 2:56). (Plaintiff Attorney Seth Gagliardi). (Defendant Attorney Jeremy Delicino cja). (erf) [2:18-mj-08543-PCL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
21 21 INFORMATION as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1-7. (jjg)(jrd)
Related: [-]
22 22 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez. (jjg)(jrd)
Related: [-]
23 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford in El Centro: Arraignment on the information as to Adrian Gastelum-Gonzalez (1) Count 1-7 held on 5/3/2018. Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 6/8/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. The defendant may remain in El Centro and schedule a plea before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. Alternatively, counsel is directed to contact the clerk for Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks if a Change of Plea Hearing needs to be scheduled in San Diego. (Interpreter Ana Reyna). (CD# 5/3/2018 KSC 1: 1:44 - 1:48). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Chiang). (Defendant Attorney Anton Vialtsin s/a for Jeremy Delicino cja). (no document attached) (erf)
Related: [-]