Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:David L Russell
Case #: 5:18-cv-00545
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2018
Terminated:Aug 27, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Dec 01, 2018 3:54 AM CST
Defendant
Eric Corl
Represented By
Philip J Outhier
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Jessica L Caruthers
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Corradini
Represented By
Philip J Outhier
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Jessica L Caruthers
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
John Does
Represented By
Philip J Outhier
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Jessica L Caruthers
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Idea Buyer LLC
Represented By
Philip J Outhier
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Jessica L Caruthers
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jess McPheron
Represented By
Philip J Outhier
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Jessica L Caruthers
Brown Outhier & Caruthers PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Roberts
Represented By
Tyler L Gentry
Gungoll Jackson Collins Box & Devoll-Enid
contact info
Patrick L Neville, Jr
Gungoll Jackson Collins Box & Devoll-Enid
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, August 27, 2018
7 7 notice ~Notice (other) Mon 08/27 1:25 PM
NOTICE (other) by Jason Roberts of Dismissal With Prejudice (Gentry, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
6 6 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 07/06 12:02 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration, the parties are compelled to arbitrate each of Plaintiffs claims consistent with the agreement. Meanwhile, this action is STAYED pending arbitration, as more fully set out. Additionally, the parties shall notify the Court of the arbitration result within thirty (30) days of completion and of their desire to dismiss the suit or lift the stay. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 07/06/18. (nv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
5 5 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/25 11:29 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re2 MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY LITIGATION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION filed by All Defendants. (Caruthers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
4 4 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/18 4:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY LITIGATION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION filed by Jason Roberts.(Gentry, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit Agreement
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/18 4:32 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler L Gentry on behalf of Jason Roberts (Gentry, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
2 2 motion Dismiss Mon 06/11 3:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY LITIGATION AND COMPEL ARBITRATION by All Defendants.(Caruthers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Fast Track Agreement
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
misc Payment for a Civil Case Tue 06/05 8:55 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2713761. (Caruthers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 06/04 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Garfield County District Court, case number CJ-2018-130 filed by John Does, Eric Corl (individually), Jess McPheron (as a partner, officer, and/or managing member/member of Idea Buyer, LLC), Idea Buyer LLC, Eric Corl (as an owner, partner, officer, and/or managing member/member of Idea Buyer, LLC), Michael Corradini (individually), Michael Corradini (as a partner, officer, and/or managing member/member of Idea Buyer, LLC), Jess McPheron (individually).(nv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plantiff's Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet