County of Sutter v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45640 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 2:18-cv-01140 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:55 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Albertsons LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Company
|
|
Defendant
Longs Drugs, Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Sutter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/15/2019 2:31 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 329 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants by County of Sutter. Attorney Fiske, John Paul added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7648864)(Fiske, John) [Transferred from caed on 6/4/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., The Kroger Co., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Thrifty Payless, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Paul Fiske* *Baron & Budd, P.C.* *603 North Coast Highway, Suite G* *Solana Beach, CA 92075*. (Washington, S) [Transferred from caed on 6/4/2018.] | |
3 | 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Washington, S) [Transferred from caed on 6/4/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from caed on 6/4/2018.] | |
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Eastern. Case number 2:18-cv-01140. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |