County of Contra Costa v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45656 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:18-cv-02705 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:57 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Contra Costa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/15/2019 12:54 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 314 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC , McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc. , Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc(Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12335156). Filed by County of Contra Costa, People of the State of California.(Fiske, John) Modified on 5/9/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/4/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/4/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/4/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/12/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/4/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-33) by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Ohio re MDL No. 2804. (slhS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 6/4/2018.] | |
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 3:18-cv-02705. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |