Cunningham v. Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00518 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 02, 2018 3:32 AM CST |
Defendant
National Congress of Employers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
MedSense Guarantee Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Champion Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Broadspire, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Axis Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Asentra Health Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unified Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Craig Cunningham
5543 Edmondson Pike Suite 248
Nashville, TN 37211 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Cost Containment Group, Inc.
Terminated: 04/13/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Maduno
Terminated: 08/08/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ada Maduno
Terminated: 08/08/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Loyal American Life Insurance Company
Terminated: 08/21/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC
Terminated: 08/21/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shirley Garcia
Terminated: 01/16/2018
|
|
Defendant
GIP Technology, Inc.
Terminated: 08/08/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Health Hub, LLC
Terminated: 08/21/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chubb Group Insurance Company
Terminated: 01/19/2018
|
|
Defendant
CIGNA Corporation
Terminated: 08/21/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric Banks
Terminated: 01/16/2018
|
|
Defendant
Amalgamated Life Insurance Company
Terminated: 08/21/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alliance for consumers USA, Inc.
Terminated: 08/21/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
316 | 316
misc
Entry of Judgment
Mon 08/09 2:11 PM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:315 Order. (jm) |
|
315 | 315
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/09 2:11 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. (Doc. No.314 ). As the only remaining Defendant, Ascentra Health Solutions, LLC, has not participated in this case, the Court finds dismissal without prejudice is appropriate. Accordingly, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/9/2021. (jm) |
|
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
314 | 314
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/05 6:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Craig Cunningham (Bacon, Adrian) |