City of Winston-Salem v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45658 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:18-cv-00416 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:57 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Winston-Salem
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:24 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Set flag for Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from ncmd on 6/5/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2351678.), filed by CITY OF WINSTON-SALEM.(WHITAKER, GARRY) [Transferred from ncmd on 6/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CONTITONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-34) re: MDL 2804 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of 6/4/2018. Received and filed on 6/5/2018. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from ncmd on 6/5/2018.] | |
3 | 3 MDL TRANFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-34) transferring this action to the NDOH. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from ncmd on 6/5/2018.] | |
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:18-cv-00416. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |