CAP-XX, Ltd. v. Ioxus, Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Colm F Connolly |
Referred: | Sherry R Fallon |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00849 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 02, 2018 3:59 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Ioxus, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
CAP-XX, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ioxus, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAP-XX, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 02 2020
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 101 filed by Ioxus, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/2/2020. (nmf) |