PRICE v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Charles J Kahn, Jr |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01398 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 03, 2018 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant
LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES D. PRICE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 09/25 1:18 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re10 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by CHARLES D. PRICE. No action or court order needed. Case is terminated. (sdw) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 09/25 11:32 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CHARLES D. PRICE. (FINELLI, DANIEL) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 09/25 12:58 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:10 Stipulation of Dismissal. (sdw) |
||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order Staying Case
Fri 08/03 9:28 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE Re: 8 Notice of Settlement. The proceedings in this matter are hereby STAYED for a period of 60 days. Upon completion of the settlement, the parties shall promptly file a stipulation of dismissal or otherwise file a status report upon expiration of the period of stay. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2018. Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 10/2/2018 . (djb) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 08/02 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by CHARLES D. PRICE (SOLOWAY, DANIEL) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 08/02 4:18 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 Notice of Settlement (djb) |
||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Tue 07/17 3:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA CORPORATION for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.. (LEHNER, STEVEN) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/09 10:49 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/23/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/22/2018 . Discovery due by 1/7/2019 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/9/2018. (sdw) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/09 9:22 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 07/09 10:30 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:5 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) |
||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/21 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARLES D. PRICE. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 6/18/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (SOLOWAY, DANIEL) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/07 8:46 AM
Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (sdw) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/07 8:39 AM
COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA filed by CHARLES D. PRICE. ($400.00 filing fee paid, receipt #AFLNDC-4198509) (sdw) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons | ||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/06 4:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SOLOWAY, DANIEL) |