ATTAWAY v. COIL
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles J Kahn, Jr |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00271 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Petitioner
ASHLEY ATTAWAY
|
|
Respondent
CRAIG E COIL
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Mon 11/19 3:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 13 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 2/19/2019 (amm) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Order on Report and Recommendation
Mon 11/19 3:16 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 12 : The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, The petition for writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241, ECF No. 1, is DENIED. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/19/18. (amm) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 11/13 10:11 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (no objections filed) (sdw) |
||
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 10/12 11:09 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 be DENIED. - R&R flag set Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 10/12/2018. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/8/2018 . (alb) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Response/Reply
Fri 10/05 1:57 PM
REPLY by ASHLEY ATTAWAY to9 Response to Habeas Petition by ASHLEY ATTAWAY. (alb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 10/05 1:58 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,9 Response to Habeas Petition,11 Reply to Response. (alb) |
||
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 09/28 1:28 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:10 Order. (No reply filed.) (alb) |
||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/28 8:32 AM
ORDER re 9 Response to Habeas Petition. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply to the government's response. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 08/27/2018. (MB) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 08/22 10:51 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:9 Response to1 Habeas Petition. (alb) |
||
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Tue 08/21 5:10 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by CRAIG E COIL. (GROGAN, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Martin Declaration with attachments | ||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 07/10 3:50 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Federal Correctional Institute, Attn: Craig Coil, Warden1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,5 Order. (alb) |
|
7 | 7
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 07/10 9:35 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Pam Bondi, re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,5 Order. (alb) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/02 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JABUS GROGAN on behalf of CRAIG E COIL (GROGAN, ANDREW) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/22 12:39 PM
ORDER The clerk of court is directed to hand deliver or send by certified mail copies of the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this order to the respondent, the United States Attorney for this district, and the Attorney General of the United States. Respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a response to the petition. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 6/22/2018. (alb) Modified on 6/22/2018 Copies mailed as directed. (alb) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 06/21 2:07 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:3 Order. (3 service copies receive.) (alb) |
||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/20 2:52 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re: 4 Filing Fee Received. (vkm) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 06/20 2:50 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN400034400. Fee status updated to paid. (vkm) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/07 1:08 PM
ORDER - The clerk shall send petitioner a complete set of forms for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days from the date of this order, petitioner shall submit either the completed in forma pauperis motion or payment in the amount of $5.00 and petitioner shall submit to the court 3 identical service copies of her 1 petition for writ of habeas corpus. This case number should be written on the copies. ( Miscellaneous Deadline for form or fee - by 7/9/2018 .) (form and order mailed) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 6/7/2018. (alb) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Wed 06/06 12:49 PM
Notice to Pro Se Litigant (alb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 06/06 12:48 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ASHLEY ATTAWAY. (No service copies, IFP motion or fee.) (alb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/06 12:50 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (alb) |