Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:18-cv-11187
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1218(2) Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2018
Terminated:Nov 05, 2020
Last checked: Monday Dec 03, 2018 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Robert H Fennessy
Regina M. Ryan Louison Costello Condon Pfaff 101 Summer Street, 4th Floor,
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Alexandra R. Hassell
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Regina M. Ryan
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Maurice J Splaine
Regina M. Ryan Louison Costello Condon Pfaff 101 Summer Street, 4th Floor,
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Alexandra R. Hassell
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Regina M. Ryan
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of Kingston
Regina M. Ryan Louison Costello Condon Pfaff 101 Summer Street, 4th Floor,
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Alexandra R. Hassell
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Regina M. Ryan
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tim Ballinger
Represented By
Elijah Bresley
Law Office Of Joseph L. Sulman, Esq.
contact info
Joseph L. Sulman
Law Office Of Joseph L. Sulman, Esq.
contact info

GPO Dec 10 2019
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment (Halley, Taylor)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 05, 2020
84 84 1 pgs order Settlement Order of Dismissal Thu 11/05 12:30 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
83 83 adr Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider Wed 11/04 12:50 PM
Magistrate Judge Dein: REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
82 82 notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Wed 11/04 12:35 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling 11/6/2020 Status Conference. This matter has been reported settled; an Order of Dismissal shall enter. (Bono, Christine)
Related: [-]