Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:18-cv-11188
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2018
Terminated:Sep 13, 2018
Last checked: Monday Dec 03, 2018 4:36 AM EST
Defendant
ADA Management Services, LLC
Defendant
Brookline Progressive Dental Team, PC
Represented By
Christian G. Samito
Samito Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Hyejin Kwak
Represented By
Christian G. Samito
Samito Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Policy No. QMP1439119
Represented By
Christopher P. Flanagan
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, October 29, 2018
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/29 2:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Policy No. QMP1439119. (Flanagan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
10 10 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Wed 09/12 12:21 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND CLOSING ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice - Other Wed 09/12 12:20 PM
NOTICE; Counsel have reported that this case has settled. A 30 days settlement order of dismissal will enter and this case will be closed. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/10 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian G. Samito on behalf of Brookline Progressive Dental Team, PC, Hyejin Kwak (Samito, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/08 12:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed ADA Management Services, LLC served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Flanagan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/08 12:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Brookline Progressive Dental Team, PC served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Flanagan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/08 12:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Hyejin Kwak served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Flanagan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
4 4 utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 06/08 1:20 PM
Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 9/4/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 06/06 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to ADA Management Services, LLC, Brookline Progressive Dental Team, PC, Hyejin Kwak. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 06/06 3:32 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/06 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Policy No. QMP1439119 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7173313 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Policy No. QMP1439119.(Flanagan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Insurance Policy,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Supplement Category Form