Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Shelly D Dick
Referred: Richard L Bourgeois, Jr
Case #: 3:18-cv-00613
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2018
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 03, 2018 3:27 AM CST
Defendant
Rick Butterfield
Represented By
Jennifer E. Michel
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Lexi T. Holinga
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
Patrick Hayes Hunt
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga
contact info
Ericka Richoux
contact info
Jeffrey Allan Riggs
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
F. Charles Marionneaux
Blenvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Vlator & Holinga,a.P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Eric Snelgrove
Represented By
Lexi T. Holinga
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
F. Charles Marionneaux
Blenvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Vlator & Holinga,a.P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Boise Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer E. Michel
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Lexi T. Holinga
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
Patrick Hayes Hunt
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga
contact info
Ericka Richoux
contact info
Jeffrey Allan Riggs
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
F. Charles Marionneaux
Blenvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Vlator & Holinga,a.P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Boise Packaging & Newsprint LLC
Represented By
Jennifer E. Michel
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Lexi T. Holinga
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
Patrick Hayes Hunt
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga
contact info
Ericka Richoux
contact info
Jeffrey Allan Riggs
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
F. Charles Marionneaux
Blenvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Vlator & Holinga,a.P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Packaging Corporation of America
Represented By
Jennifer E. Michel
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Lexi T. Holinga
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
Patrick Hayes Hunt
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga
contact info
Ericka Richoux
contact info
Jeffrey Allan Riggs
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator And Holinga, Apllc
contact info
F. Charles Marionneaux
Blenvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Vlator & Holinga,a.P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Pamela Green
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Woodard
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael McCullough
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Johnson
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Harrington
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Darbonne
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Cunningham
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Demon Benjamin
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry Bailey
Represented By
Tony Clayton
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Kala Sellers
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Fruge'
Clayton & Fruge
contact info
Richard J Ward, III
Clayton, Fruge & Ward
contact info
Jonathan Kyle Findley
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info
Adam Lewis
Arnold & Itkin LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 27 2019
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Christopher Harrington, Eric Woodard, Jerry Bailey, Charles Cunningham, Michael McCullough, Pamela Green, Michael Darbonne, Michael Johnson, Demon Benjamin. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that that the 4 Motion to Remand and the 3 Motion to Amend be DENIED, and that Plaintiffs claims against Snelgrove be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. In the event this recommendation is adopted, the undersigned further RECOMMENDS that this matter be referred to the undersigned for a scheduling conference. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/27/2019. (SWE) Modified on 2/28/2019 to edit docket entry association (SGO).
GPO Mar 19 2019
r is hereby REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a Scheduling Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/18/2019. (KAH) RULING Adopting 20 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 4 Motion to Remand and the 3 Motion to Amend are hereby DENIED, and Plaintiff's claims against Snelgrove are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This matte
GPO Jul 28 2021
RULING granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/27/2021. (EDC)
GPO Jun 24 2022
RULING granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Reconsideration of 72 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/24/2022. (SWE)
GPO Nov 27 2023
RULING AND ORDER denying 124 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order. A second corporate deposition of Defendant Packaging Corporation of America shall take place by no later than 12/18/2023. Granting in part 126 Motion to Compel. By no later than 12/11/2023 Plaintiffs shall provide cell phone records for all texts, chats, emails, or other digital or written communications, sent or received by any plaintiff as stated herein. If Plaintiffs do not have responsive records, a verification under oath shall be provided so stating. By no later than 12/11/2023 Plaintiff Michael Johnson shall provide a completed Request Pertaining to Military Records form to PCA to enable PCA to obtain Michael Johnson's military records related to any medical issues. This motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/27/2023. (EDC)
GPO Dec 14 2023
RULING granting 170 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Eric Van Iderstine Regarding Defendants' Knowledge and State of Mind. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/14/2023. (SWE)
GPO Mar 14 2024
OMNIBUS RULING denying 193 Motion to Strike Dr. Todd Cowen's "Amended" Life Care Plans. Ruling is hereby deferred on 195 Motion in Limine to Exclude from Evidence and Prohibit from Publication Photographs and Graphic Depictions of the Deceased. Regarding 196 Motion in Limine, objections to testimonial evidence are deferred to trial as stated herein. Denied without prejudice 197 Motion in Limine to Exclude Stale Damages Evidence to urging objections at trial. Granting 198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Undisclosed Expert Opinions and 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of OSHA and CSB Investigations, Reports, Citations, and Settlements. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/13/2024. (EDC)
GPO Apr 03 2024
RULING granting in part and denying in part 202 Omnibus Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence. The Motion in Limine to exclude the Elite records is DENIED, without prejudice; the Motion in Limine to exclude criminal history records of plaintiffs is GRANTED; the Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of Plaintiffs substance abuse is DENIED, without prejudice. The Motion in Limine to exclude evidence and testimony of drug use by the Elite welders at the time of the accident is DENIED; the Motion in Limine to exclude surveillance of the Plaintiffs and social media posts by the Plaintiffs is DENIED, without prejudice.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/3/2024. (SWE)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
326 326 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Fri 03/07 11:06 AM
ORDER granting325 Motion to Withdraw295 Bill of Costs. The bill of costs and motion to tax costs is hereby deemed withdrawn and no longer pending on the Court's docket. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 03/07/2025. (CIS)
Related: [-]