Colorado District Court
Judge:John L Kane
Case #: 1:18-cv-01405
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2018
Terminated:Jul 18, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 03, 2018 2:56 AM MST
Defendant
Tom Beach
Represented By
Cathy Havener Greer
Wells Anderson & Race, LLC
contact info
Katherine M.L. Pratt
Wells Anderson & Race, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Tom (I) Beach
Represented By
Cathy Havener Greer
Wells Anderson & Race, LLC
contact info
Katherine M.L. Pratt
Wells Anderson & Race, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Southeast Weld Fire Protection District
Represented By
Cathy Havener Greer
Wells Anderson & Race, LLC
contact info
Katherine M.L. Pratt
Wells Anderson & Race, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Carl Johnson
Represented By
John Welling Stewart
Woodley & Mcgillivary LLP
contact info
Naomi Y. Perera
Kelman Buescher Firm
contact info
Sara Lyn Faulman
Woodley & Mcgillivary LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Woodley
Woodley & Mcgillivary LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, July 18, 2019
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 07/18 12:41 PM
ORDER granting42 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Southeast Weld Fire Protection District. Defendant Southeast Weld Fire Protection District is dismissed with prejudice and each party shall bear its or his own attorney fees and costs. This matter is resolved and the action is DISMISSED. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 7/18/2019.(cthom, )
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Dismiss Thu 07/18 11:22 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Southeast Weld Fire Protection District by Defendant Southeast Weld Fire Protection District.(Pratt, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) on Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, July 11, 2019
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Thu 07/11 2:44 PM
ORDER granting40 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Tom Beach. Defendant Beach is dismissed with prejudice and each party shall bear its or his own attorney fees and costs. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 7/11/2019.(cthom, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
40 40 motion Dismiss Party Wed 07/10 12:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Tom Beach by Defendants Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection District.(Greer, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) on Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Tom Beach
Friday, June 14, 2019
39 39 order Minute Order Fri 06/14 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file either a joint status report or dismissal paperwork on or before 7/29/2019. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 6/14/2019. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
38 38 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 06/14 10:00 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Settlement Conference held on 6/13/2019. (slibi, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
37 37 misc Reassigning Judge Thu 05/30 3:21 PM
Upon the passing of Judge Richard P. Matsch, and pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), this case has been reassigned to Judge John L. Kane effective this date. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01405-JLK. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 04/23 8:51 AM
ORDER Granting35 Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2019, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/23/2019. (ktera)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
35 35 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Mon 04/22 3:36 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling Order by Defendants Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection District.(Pratt, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Friday, April 12, 2019
34 34 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Fri 04/12 3:53 PM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:33 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information filed by attorney Sara Lyn Faulman. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Fri 04/12 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Sara Lyn Faulman (Faulman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
32 32 order Minute Order Wed 04/10 1:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER re Settlement Conference set for 6/13/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/10/2019. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER (slibi, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
31 31 order Minute Order Fri 04/05 11:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER re that on or before Thursday, April 11, 2019, the parties shall jointly contact Chambers (303-335-2403) to clear dates for the Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/05/2019. (slibi, )
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 04/05 8:22 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to the Joint Motion to Refer Case for Settlement Conference29 , filed on April 4, 2019, this civil action is referred to United States Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for the purpose of convening a settlement conference and such other procedures as the Magistrate Judge may deem appropriate for facilitating settlement of this case, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/5/2019. (ktera)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
29 29 motion Hearing/Conference Thu 04/04 2:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Hearing/Conference (Settlement Conference) by Defendants Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection District.(Greer, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
28 28 order Protective Order Tue 12/04 9:52 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/4/2018. (ktera)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
27 27 motion Protective Order Mon 12/03 3:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection District.(Pratt, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, October 01, 2018
26 26 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 10/01 2:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER approved and signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/1/2018. Discovery due by 6/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2019. (babia)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 10/01 2:35 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference proceedings held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/1/2018. Scheduling Order approved and signed. FTR: K. Terasaki. (babia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
24 24 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/05 1:33 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Pursuant to Procedural Order Number One entered by this Court on July 16, 2018, counsel have contacted chambers to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16 and it is ORDERED that a scheduling conference will be held on October 1, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 12:00 noon on September 21, 2018. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/5/2018. (evana, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
23 23 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Tue 08/07 12:34 PM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:22 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information filed by attorney Naomi Y. Perera. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 08/07 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Naomi Y. Perera (Perera, Naomi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
21 21 13 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 08/02 2:38 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint (First) by Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection District.(Greer, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Thu 07/26 2:07 PM
ORDER Granting19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Permission to Permit Lead Counsel to Attend the Rule 26(f)(2) Conference Telephonically, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/26/2018. (ktera)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Leave Thu 07/26 1:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically or, Alternatively, to Extend the Deadline by Plaintiff Howard Carl Johnson.(Faulman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Thursday, July 19, 2018
18 18 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 07/19 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas A. Woodley on behalf of Howard Carl JohnsonAttorney Thomas A. Woodley added to party Howard Carl Johnson(pty:pla) (Woodley, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 07/19 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Welling Stewart on behalf of Howard Carl JohnsonAttorney John Welling Stewart added to party Howard Carl Johnson(pty:pla) (Stewart, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Notice of Filing Amended Pleading Thu 07/19 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re15 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Howard Carl Johnson(Faulman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 18 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/19 11:56 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Howard Carl Johnson.(Faulman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
14 14 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/16 10:44 AM
PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26 (f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telephone chambers [303-844-4627] within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx. Counsel for the defendant shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/16/2018. (ktera)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/13 9:57 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection District.(Greer, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 06/22 3:18 PM
ORDER Granting11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, to and including July 13, 2018, to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/22/2018. (ktera)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 06/22 2:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection District.(Greer, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 06/22 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection DistrictAttorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Tom Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Tom (I) Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Southeast Weld Fire Protection District(pty:dft) (Pratt, Katherine)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 06/22 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cathy Havener Greer on behalf of Tom Beach, Tom (I) Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection DistrictAttorney Cathy Havener Greer added to party Tom Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Cathy Havener Greer added to party Tom (I) Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Cathy Havener Greer added to party Southeast Weld Fire Protection District(pty:dft) (Greer, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing/Service Mon 06/18 11:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service of Affidavit of Service on Tom Beach, Fire Chief by Plaintiff Howard Carl Johnson.(Perera, Naomi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavid of Service
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing/Service Mon 06/18 11:30 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service of Affidavit of Service on Irene Burke by Plaintiff Howard Carl Johnson.(Perera, Naomi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Thursday, June 07, 2018
6 6 misc Summons Issued Thu 06/07 2:40 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (evana, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Supplement/Amendment Thu 06/07 1:10 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST by Plaintiff Howard Carl Johnson. (Perera, Naomi) (Modified on 6/7/2018 edited the title of the text to reflect Request for a Summons to Issue)(evana, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Exhibits Thu 06/07 9:12 AM
Exhibits in Support of1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet Attachment A by Plaintiff Howard Carl Johnson. (Faulman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
3 3 misc Summons Issued Wed 06/06 4:49 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rroge, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 06/06 4:43 PM
Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/06 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Tom Beach, Southeast Weld Fire Protection District (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6140094)Attorney Naomi Y. Perera added to party Howard Carl Johnson(pty:pla), filed by Howard Carl Johnson.(Perera, Naomi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons