United States of America et al v. Signature Healthcare, LLC et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00027 |
Nature of Suit | 375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act |
Cause | 31:3729 False Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Jun 08, 2018 11:03 PM CDT |
Defendant
LP Columbia, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Signature Healthcare Consulting Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Signature Healthcare, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Signature Payroll Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Signature Rehab Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kristi Emerson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LeeAnn Tuesca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
92 | 92
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 03/30 3:21 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No.91 ), indicating that all matters in dispute have been resolved and this case should be dismissed. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/30/2020. (mg) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
91 | 91
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 03/27 3:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims by LP Columbia, LLC, Signature Healthcare Consulting Services, LLC, Signature Healthcare, LLC, Signature Payroll Services, LLC, Signature Rehab Services, LLC, Stakeholder Payroll Services, LLC. (Peters, Mark) |