Wilkinson County Georgia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45671 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Middle, 5:18-cv-00169 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:58 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Wilkinson County Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:35 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL J BURTON LEBLANC, PAUL T FARRELL, PETER J MOUGEY, ARCHIE C LAMB, JR, PAGE A POERSCHKE, LAURA S DUNNING, MICHAEL J FULLER, JAMES C PETERSON, ANTHONY J MAJESTRO - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf). [Transferred from gamd on 6/7/2018.] | ||
Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file ; Related document(:1 Complaint, filed by WILKINSON COUNTY GEORGIA); Complaint was not dated. Even though filed on May 16, 2018, there was a date line marked "April ___ 2018". Additionally, the bar numbers of Georgia attorneys as required by Local 83.1.2B was not on the signature page of the pleading filed (tlf). [Transferred from gamd on 6/7/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 168 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2877628, $400 filed by WILKINSON COUNTY GEORGIA(BOLING, WILLIAM) [Transferred from gamd on 6/7/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Attorney attachment to civil cover sheet | ||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern Distriict of Ohio. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 6/20/2018. (tlf) [Transferred from gamd on 6/7/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (tlf). [Transferred from gamd on 6/7/2018.] | |
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Middle. Case number 5:18-cv-00169. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |