Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-13777

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Richard E Fehling
Case #: 4:18-ap-00133
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2018
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Worley & Obetz, Inc.
85 White Oak Road
Manheim, PA 17545
Represented By
Worley & Obetz, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Amerigreen Energy, Inc.
85 White Oak Road
Manheim, PA 17545
Represented By
Amerigreen Energy, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Amerigreen Propane, LLC
85 White Oak Road
Manheim, PA 17545
Represented By
Amerigreen Propane, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Daveler
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER D. LOIZIDES
Loizides & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Marco Perez
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER D. LOIZIDES
Loizides & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/29 4:19 PM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-133 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (D., Tasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/16 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #19 )
Monday, May 13, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 05/13 2:04 PM
Ordered the the dismissal and closing of Adversary Proceeding 18-132, with which the above two (2) captioned Adversary Proceedings were jointly administered, see doc. #14 in Adversary Proceeding 18-133 and doc. # 13 in Adversary Proceeding 18-134; It is hereby ORDERED that the above captioned two (2) Adversary Proceedings are hereby dismissed and shall be closed. Related [+]. (W., Christine)
Related: [-] 14
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 05/13 2:05 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:18-ap-133. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
18 18 court Transfer case from Chief Judge Coleman to Judge Mayer Mon 04/01 8:32 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Patricia M. Mayer. Involvement of Chief Judge Magdeline D. Coleman Terminated. See Miscellaneous Case Number 24-03004 mdc . (Moy Ng, Yim)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
court Transfer case from Judge Mayer to Coleman Mon 03/16 1:11 PM
Due to a technical error, this case has been transferred from the Honorable Judge Patricia M. Mayer, back to the Honorable Chief Judge Magdeline D Coleman . (A., Clarice)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
17 17 court Transfer case from Judge Fehling to Coleman Fri 05/31 1:15 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Magdeline D. Coleman Involvement of Chief Judge Richard E. Fehling Terminated. See Miscellaneous Case Number 19-03003 ref . (A., Clarice)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
16 16 court Transfer case from Judge Fehling to Coleman Wed 05/22 4:23 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Magdeline D. Coleman Involvement of Chief Judge Richard E. Fehling Terminated. See Miscellaneous Case Number 19-03003 ref . (A., Clarice)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 18, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 08/19 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #14 )
Thursday, August 16, 2018
14 14 order Joint Administration Thu 08/16 3:03 PM
An order (the Class Action Joint Administration Order) has been enteredin this adversary proceeding directing the joint administration of theadversary proceedings listed below for procedural purposes only. Thedockets in Adversary No. 18-00132 (REF) should be consulted for allmatters affecting these adversary proceedings. The following adversaryproceedings are jointly administered pursuant to this Class Action JointAdministration Order: (i) Daveler, et al. v. Worley & Obetz, Inc., et al.,Adversary No. 18-00132 (REF); (ii) Daveler, et al. v. Worley & Obetz, Inc.,et al., Adversary No. 18-00133 (REF); and (iii) Daveler, et al. v. Worley &Obetz, Inc., et al., Adversary No. 18-00134 (REF). Related [+] Lead Case 18-132. (H., Lisa)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of No Response Wed 08/15 1:43 PM
Certificate of No Response to Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Authorizing and Directing the Joint Administration of Plaintiffs Class Action Adversary Proceedings Filed by MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ on behalf of Christine C. Shubert Related [+]. (MENKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
12 12 misc Withdrawal & Entry of Appearance Tue 07/31 5:21 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance of Christopher D. Loizides and entry of appearance of Robert E. Chernicoff Filed by CHRISTOPHER D. LOIZIDES, ROBERT E. CHERNICOFF on behalf of Amy Daveler, Marco Perez. (CHERNICOFF, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
11 11 misc Joint Statement Wed 07/25 12:38 PM
Joint Statement Filed by MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ on behalf of Christine C. Shubert. (MENKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Motion Thu 07/19 4:01 PM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by Christine C. Shubert. Hearing scheduled 8/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at mad - Courtroom 1, Third Floor.(MANFREY, JASON)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Joint Administration Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for Entry of an Order Authorizing and Directing Joint Administration of Plaintiffs Class Action Adversary Proceedings ading Court
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
9 9 motion Joint Administration Thu 07/19 3:59 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for Entry of an Order Authorizing and Directing Joint Administration of Plaintiffs Class Action Adversary Proceedings Filed by Christine C. Shubert Represented by JASON CHRISTOPHER MANFREY (Counsel). (MANFREY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, July 15, 2018
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 07/16 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/15/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Friday, July 13, 2018
7 7 order Pre-Trial Order Fri 07/13 3:51 PM
Pre-Trial Order #1. Pre-Trial/Settlement Conference scheduled 4/24/2019 at 09:30 AM at mad - Courtroom 1, Third Floor Related [+]. Joint Pre-Trial Statement due by 4/19/2019. Joint Jurisdictional Statement due by 7/25/2018. Motions Due by 3/15/2019. Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Joint Statement due by 7/25/2018. (B., Keith)
Related: [-] ading Court
6 6 court Conference Call Held Fri 07/13 3:45 PM
Preliminary Pretrial Conference Call Held and Concluded. Related [+]. (Need 60 days to determine class and 30 days for class certificate. Need 6 months for discovery. Possible Summary Judgment motion, Pre-Trial Order to follow. (B., Keith)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-00133 Complaint
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 07/11 11:29 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by STEVEN K. LUDWIG Filed by STEVEN K. LUDWIG on behalf of Christine C. Shubert. (LUDWIG, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/09 11:25 AM
Answer to Complaint Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint Filed by Christine C. Shubert, Chapter 7 Trustee for the estates of Worley & Obertz, Inc., AMERIgreen Energy, Inc. and AMERIgreen Propane, LLC.(MENKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 28, 2018
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/28 4:19 PM
Certificate of Service for Summons and Complaint Filed by CHRISTOPHER D. LOIZIDES on behalf of Amy Daveler, Marco Perez Related [+]. (LOIZIDES, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, June 08, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 06/08 1:43 PM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Amerigreen Energy, Inc. Date Issued 6/8/2018, Answer Due 7/8/2018; Amerigreen Propane, LLC Date Issued 6/8/2018, Answer Due 7/8/2018; Worley & Obetz, Inc. Date Issued 6/8/2018, Answer Due 7/8/2018. (B., Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/07 6:34 PM
Adversary case 18-00133 Complaint by CHRISTOPHER D. LOIZIDES on behalf of Amy Daveler, Marco Perez against Worley & Obetz, Inc., Amerigreen Energy, Inc., Amerigreen Propane, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Class Action Adversary Proceeding Complaint For Violation of Warn Act 29 U.S.C. § 2101, Et Seq. . (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (LOIZIDES, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]