GCC BUNKERS LLC v. CHEM SIRIUS, I.M.O. NO. 9558397
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | C Darnell Jones, II |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02427 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:31301-31343 Maritime Commercial Instruments and Liens Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 05, 2018 4:38 AM EST |
Custodian
RING MARITIME SERVICES
|
|
Defendant
CHEM SIRIUS, I.M.O. NO. 9558397
|
|
Plaintiff
GCC BUNKERS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GCC BUNKERS LLC (RHOADS, STEPHEN) |
|
Saturday, June 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER GRANTING4 MOTION TO APPOINT CUSTODIAN; RING MARITIME SERVICES IS APPOINTED TO ACT AS A SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN. (SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II) ON 06/09/2018; 06/09/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (nd) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ORDER GRANTING3 MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT IN REM AND DIRECTING THE CLERK TO ISSSUE A WARRANT FOR THE ARREST OF THE VESSEL CHEM SIRIUS, I.M.O. NO 9558397. (SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II) ON 06/09/2018; 06/09/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/9/2018) (nd, ) |
|
4 | 4
![]() MOTION to Appoint Custodian filed by GCC BUNKERS LLC..(KUFFLER, ALFRED) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by GCC BUNKERS LLC..(KUFFLER, ALFRED) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
order
Warrant Issued
Sat 06/09 11:25 AM
ARREST WARRANT ISSUED FORWARDED TO THE U.S. MARSHAL (nd) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GCC BUNKERS LLC.(nd, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against CHEM SIRIUS, I.M.O. NO. 9558397 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number Paper Receipt 552.), filed by GCC BUNKERS LLC.(nd, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/11 9:36 AM
Summons Issued as to CHEM SIRIUS, I.M.O. NO. 9558397. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/11/18 (jwl, ) Modified on 6/11/2018 (jwl, ) |