Sines v. Kessler
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert S Lasnik |
Case #: | 2:18-mc-00062 |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Western District of Virginia, 3:17-cv-00072 NKM |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
1 - Order
Thu 06/28 12:38 PM
ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. This matter comes before the Court on an unnamed domain owners motion to quash a subpoena issued to eNOM, Inc., in a civil case pending in the Western District of Virginia. The party seeking the discovery has opposed the motion to quash. In light of the contested nature of this proceeding, the Clerk of Court is directed to give this matter a civil action number and assign it in rotation. (CDA) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry)
Thu 06/28 12:52 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to the court's order dated 6/27/18, case number MC18-62 originally assigned to the Honorable Robert S Lasnik is now assigned a civil case number C18-962 and is reassigned randomly in rotation. After random reassignment, the case remains with the Honorable Robert S Lasnik. All future pleadings must now bear the newly assigned civil case number. (CDA) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 06/25 11:07 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Michael Peinovich, to1 MOTION to Quash.(Peinovich, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/25 7:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Movant Unnamed Domain Owner re1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Documents (Hurvitz, Ralph) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice re Pro Se Registration
Fri 06/22 4:02 PM
NOTICE: Defendant Michael Peinovich has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (ELS) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 06/22 2:22 PM
Party Michael Peinovich, defendant in the underlying case in the Western District of Virginia added. Mr. Peinovich has submitted a registration form for electronic filing and indicated he will be filing a response to the1 Motion to Quash Subpoena. (ELS) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Quash
Fri 06/08 3:23 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Documents, filed by Movant Unnamed Domain Owner. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 6/29/2018, (FEE PAID - receipt # SEA090907) (CDA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Peinovich Subpoena to eNom, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Sines v Kessler Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Starsia Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D The Guardian | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - The Intercept, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - NPR, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 8 Email requesting new case |