|
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 08/15 9:31 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (TG)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)
Tue 08/14 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Berkley Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Thu 06/28 11:13 AM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by the Insurance Commissioner of the State of Washington on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company by Plaintiff Berkley Insurance Company on 6/22/2018 (Lether, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Waiver of Service
Wed 06/27 1:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Allen Bricker mailed on 6/20/2018 (Lether, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Wed 06/27 1:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on First Response, Inc. on 6/16/2018, filed by Plaintiff Berkley Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Wed 06/27 1:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Clark County on 6/15/2018, filed by Plaintiff Berkley Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/19 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Taylor Ross Hallvik on behalf of Defendant Clark County. (Hallvik, Taylor)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/14 3:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Berkley Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Berkley Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Tue 06/12 10:00 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/27/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/4/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Tue 06/12 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/11 12:17 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Allen Bricker, Clark County, First Response, Inc., and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(SP)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Summons,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons
|
|
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/11 11:36 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Mon 06/11 11:38 AM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/18/2018. (SP)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/08 6:44 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants Related [+], filed by Berkley Insurance Company.(Lether, Thomas)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-5350237
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons First Response, Inc.,
|
| |
Att: 4
Summons Clark County,
|
| |
Att: 5
Summons Allen Bricker
|