Habersham County, Georgia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45559 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Northern, 2:18-cv-00041 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:59 PM EST |
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Novartis AG
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc. fka Harco Drug, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
J M Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership I
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership II
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V.
|
|
Plaintiff
Habersham County, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:41 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Habersham County, Georgia. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7793813.) (dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 5/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Court Notice of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) [Transferred from gand on 5/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
Case electronically transferred to USDC Northern District of Ohio. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 5/11/2018.] | ||
Civil Case Terminated. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 5/11/2018.] | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-23 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transferred to the USDC Northern District of Ohio. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 5/11/2018.] | |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 2:18-cv-00041. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |