New York Southern District Court
Judge:George B Daniels
Referred: Sarah L Cave
Case #: 1:18-cv-05205
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2018
Terminated:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 07, 2018 4:30 AM EST
Defendant
Richard Mgrdechian
Represented By
Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Davidoff Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Purple Eagle Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Davidoff Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Bray
Represented By
Timothy Charles Parlatore
Parlatore Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
176 176 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 09/11 2:42 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:175 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. in favor of David Bray against Purple Eagle Entertainment, Inc., Richard Mgrdechian in the amount of $ 16,179.48. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision & Order dated September 10, 2024, the Court adopts the Report & Recommendation with a modification to the amount of damages. Plaintiff's accounting, unjust enrichment, and constructive trust claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby declared the owner of copyrights in recordings of" Amazing America" (CR Registration# PA 2-139-608), "Soldier's Christmas" (CR Registration# PAu 3-380-536), "The Marine's Hymn" (CR Registration# 2-139-600), and "God Bless America" (CR Registration # PA 2-139-604). Plaintiff is awarded the following: 1. Actual damages for copyright infringement under the Copyright Act in the amount of $15,779.48; 2. Post-judgment interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961; 3. Costs in the amount of $400.00. Accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Acting Clerk of Court Daniel Ortiz on 9/11/2024) (nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Appeal
175 175 15 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Wed 09/11 1:16 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER for167 Report and Recommendations,,,, Magistrate Judge Cave's Report is ADOPTED with a modification to the amount of damages. Plaintiff's accounting, unjust enrichment, and constructive trust claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby declared the owner of copyrights in recordings of" Amazing America" (CR Registration# PA 2-139-608), "Soldier's Christmas" (CR Registration# PAu 3-380-536), "The Marine's Hymn" (CR Registration# 2-139-600), and "God Bless America" (CR Registration # PA 2-139-604). Plaintiff is awarded the following: 1. Actual damages for copyright infringement under the Copyright Act in the amount of $15,779.48; 2. Post-judgment interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961; 3. Costs in the amount of $400.00. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment and close this action. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]