Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-24404

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:G Michael Halfenger
Case #: 2:18-ap-02130
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2018
Terminated:Jul 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Check Advance
380 S. Koeller Street
Oshkosh, WI 54902
Represented By
Check Advance
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela M Read
247 Sullivan Street, Apt. 404
Oshkosh, WI 54902
Represented By
John W. Menn
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 07/17 4:40 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:18-ap-2130: Case Dismissed by Stipulation. (mlh, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/17 4:40 PM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-2130 Closed. (mlh, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
5 5 misc Proposed Order Mon 07/16 2:27 PM
Proposed Order RE:4 - Stipulation filed by Attorney John W. Menn of Steinhilber Swanson LLP on behalf of Angela M Read. (Menn, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
4 4 misc Stipulation Mon 07/16 2:25 PM
Stipulation By Angela M Read and Check Advance to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Angela M Read (Menn, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/12 4:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Angela M Read Related [+] (Menn, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read,2 Electronic Summons Issued
2 2 court Electronic Summons Issued Tue 06/12 3:08 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 7/12/2018. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 7/17/2018. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/13/2018 at 01:00 PM by Telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. (srh, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/11 1:02 PM
Adversary case 18-02130 Complaint by Angela M Read (attorney John W. Menn) against Check Advance. Receipt Number waived, Fee Amount $350 (72 (Injunctive relief - other),02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Menn, John)
Related: [-]