FOUNTAIN v. ROGERS et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Stafford |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00274 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 07/20 9:50 AM
ORDER - Petitioner's filing (ECF No. 5 ) is treated as a notice of voluntary dismissal and this case shall be considered closed upon entry of this order. (File Destruction Deadline set for 10/18/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 7/20/2018. (ckm) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/19 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal by DOMINQUE C FOUNTAIN (ckm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 07/19 12:41 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:5 Notice of Dismissal. (ckm) |
||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 06/21 3:46 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION of Habeas Corpus. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (ckm) |
||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 06/21 3:45 PM
MOTION of Habeas Corpus by DOMINQUE C FOUNTAIN. (ckm) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 06/13 10:45 AM
ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall forward to Petitioner an application for leave to proceed IFP. The Clerk shall forward four § 2254 forms to Petitioner, writing the case number on the blank forms. (Fee/IFP due by 7/13/2018 . 2254 Petition due by 7/13/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/13/2018. (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 06/12 1:45 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (ckm) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Mon 06/11 12:31 PM
Notice to Pro Se (ckm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 06/11 12:35 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (ckm) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 06/11 12:29 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DOMINQUE C FOUNTAIN. (ckm) |