New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:18-cv-10456
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Dec 09, 2018 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC")
Represented By
MARK K. SILVER
Coughlin Duffy LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By
JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Drinker, Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
SCOTT A. JAMES
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Represented By
JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Drinker, Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
SCOTT A. JAMES
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
ASIMINA BALASKONIS
Represented By
EDWARD A. RUFFO
Rheingold Giuffra Ruffo & Plotkin, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 02/21 7:50 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (jdg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/01 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID B. RHEINGOLD on behalf of ASIMINA BALASKONIS (RHEINGOLD, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/03 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC") (SILVER, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/20 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/20 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/19 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/19 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/12 4:06 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *KIM STILLMAN* (kas, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/12 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8805514) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ASIMINA BALASKONIS.(RUFFO, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 06/12 4:02 PM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kas, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Tue 06/12 4:05 PM
Member Case Direct File on 6/12/2018, for MDL 16-2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (kas, )
Related: [-]