Wilkins v. Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01511 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 09, 2018 3:23 AM CST |
Defendant
Dallas Cowboys Football Club Ltd
|
|
Plaintiff
Erica Wilkins
|
Represented By
|
1. | Ex-Cowboys cheerleader claims in lawsuit she was paid fraction of what mascot earned (usatoday.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/13/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Erica Wilkins. (Vaught, Allen) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Wed 07/11 12:58 PM
Civil Case Terminated per5 Stipulation of Dismissal. (zkc) |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Dallas Cowboys Football Club Ltd. (ykp) |
|
3 | 3
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Erica Wilkins. (Vaught, Allen) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Erica Wilkins. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9247461) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Vaught, Allen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |