Allfrey v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Alice Theiler |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05474 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment by Court
Thu 02/28 3:54 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT; By Order of the Court, the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (TF) |
|
14 | 14
order
1 - Order
Thu 02/28 3:52 PM
ORDER RE: SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY APPEAL by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (TF) |
|
Friday, November 23, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Brief - Reply
Fri 11/23 9:37 AM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Patricia Kaye Allfrey. (Schurman, Rosemary) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Brief - Responsive
Thu 11/08 1:51 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re8 Brief - Opening by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Groebner, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 10/04 2:56 PM
ORDER granting defendant's unopposed9 Motion to Amend the Briefing Schedule. Responsive Brief due by 11/8/2018, Reply Brief due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Declaration
Wed 10/03 11:06 AM
DECLARATION of Benjamin J. Groebner filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill re9 Unopposed MOTION to Amend7 Social Security Order, (Groebner, Benjamin) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Amend
Wed 10/03 11:04 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend7 Social Security Order, , filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Noting Date 10/3/2018, (Groebner, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Brief - Opening
Tue 09/11 5:04 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Patricia Kaye Allfrey (Schurman, Rosemary) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Social Security Order - set/reset Briefing deadlines
Mon 08/13 11:33 AM
Order: Opening Brief due by 9/11/2018, Responsive Brief due by 10/9/2018, Reply Brief due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (GB) |
|
6 | 6
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Mon 08/13 8:17 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Groebner, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 6 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/21 8:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J. Groebner on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Groebner, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/13 5:00 PM
CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP) |
|
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/13 9:31 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Patricia Kaye Allfrey re2 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, (Schurman, Rosemary) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/13 8:04 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill.(GMR) |
|
Att: 1 Summons 2, | ||
Att: 2 Summons 3 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 06/13 8:03 AM
Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GMR) |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/12 5:35 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill , filed by Patricia Kaye Allfrey.(Schurman, Rosemary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons #1 of 3, | ||
Att: 3 Summons #2 of 3, | ||
Att: 4 Summons #3 of 3 |