Town of Douglas v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45706 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 4:18-cv-40076 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:02 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:52 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7145302 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Douglas.(Sandman, Richard) [Transferred from mad on 6/12/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Category Form | ||
Sunday, May 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (adminn, ) [Transferred from mad on 6/12/2018.] | |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 6/12/2018.] | |
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 36 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 6/12/2018.] | |
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 36 in MDL Case 2804 received from the Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-40076-TSH, 4:18-cv-40077-TSH, 4:18-cv-40078-TSH, 4:18-cv-40079-TSH, 4:18-cv-40080-TSH(Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 6/12/2018.] | |
6 | 6 Case Electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 6/8/18. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-40076-TSH, 4:18-cv-40077-TSH, 4:18-cv-40078-TSH, 4:18-cv-40079-TSH, 4:18-cv-40080-TSH(Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 6/12/2018.] | |
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 4:18-cv-40076. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |