New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:18-mj-08040
Case Filed:May 15, 2018
Terminated:Apr 23, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Jun 14, 2018 3:56 AM EDT
Defendant
RAVI CHIVUKULA (3)
Defendant
PARMJIT PARMAR (1)
Represented By
Jeffrey Hoffman
Windels, Marx, Lane & Mittendorf, LLP
contact info
JEFFREY C. HOFFMAN
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Defendant
SOTIRIOS ZAHARIS (2)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
PAUL ANDREW MURPHY
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
LESLIE ELIZABETH LEHNERT
U.S. Dept. Of Justice
contact info
NICHOLAS PAUL GRIPPO
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info

GPO Jul 26 2018
COPY OF AMENDED ORDER setting conditions of release as to PARMJIT PARMAR (signed by defendant Parmar and 3rd party custodian). Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/26/18. (ro, ) Modified on 7/26/2018 (ro).
GPO Jul 26 2018
ORDER as to PARMJIT PARMAR. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/26/18. (ro, )

Docket last updated: 11/20/2024 11:59 PM EST
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to PARMJIT PARMAR (1), SOTIRIOS ZAHARIS (2), and RAVI CHIVUKULA (3). (kd)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Order to Seal Case as to PARMJIT PARMAR, SOTIRIOS ZAHARIS, and RAVI CHIVUKULA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/15/2018. (kd)
Related: [-]